This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/15/2019 at 17:01:00 (UTC).

Hudock et al v. LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/09/2016 Hudock filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against LG Electronics U S A , Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are John R. Tunheim and Katherine M. Menendez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:16-CV-01220

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John R. Tunheim

Referral Judge

Katherine M. Menendez

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Breann Hudock

Eugene Mannacio

Ivan Villa Lara

Brian Fleishman

Defendants

BestBuy.com, LLC

Best Buy Co., Inc.

LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.

Best Buy Stores, L.P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel C Hedlund

Samuel J Strauss

Brittany N Resch

Luke Hudock

Hart L Robinovitch

David M Cialkowski

Alyssa Leary

Raina Borrelli

Alex Phillips

Defendant Attorneys

Alicia Paller

Peter H Walsh

Robert Benjamin Wolinsky

Phoebe Anne Wilkinson

12 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

314 #8

Exhibit(s) - 89

314 #7

Exhibit(s) - 88

314 #6

Exhibit(s) - 87

314 #5

Exhibit(s) - 84

314 #4

Exhibit(s) - 83

314 #3

Exhibit(s) - 82

314 #2

Exhibit(s) - 81

314 #1

Exhibit(s) - 16

#314

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

377 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#314) Corrected Declaration of David M. Cialkowski in Support of #223 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Brian Fleishman, Breann Hudock, Eugene Mannacio, Ivan Villa Lara. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) - 16, #2 Exhibit(s) - 81, #3 Exhibit(s) - 82, #4 Exhibit(s) - 83, #5 Exhibit(s) - 84, #6 Exhibit(s) - 87, #7 Exhibit(s) - 88, #8 Exhibit(s) - 89, #9 Exhibit(s) - 90)(Cialkowski, David) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#313) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #223 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Brian Fleishman, Breann Hudock, Eugene Mannacio, Ivan Villa Lara.(Cialkowski, David) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#312) MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #223 Motion to Certify Class filed by Brian Fleishman, Breann Hudock, Eugene Mannacio, Ivan Villa Lara.(Cialkowski, David) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#311) Declaration of Daniel C. Hedlund in Support of #223 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Brian Fleishman, Breann Hudock, Eugene Mannacio, Ivan Villa Lara. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) - A)(Cialkowski, David) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#310) STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Impracticable to Redact for #235 , #275 , #286 , #242 , #237 , #288 , #259 , #295 , #308 , #244 , #251 , #230 , #306 , #238 , #236 , #304 , #272 , #292 , #240 , #270 , #298 , #285 , #293 , #257 , #283 , #249 , #253 , #299 , #305 , #300 , #239 , #234 , #309 , #268 , #247 , #273 , #297 , #278 , #255 , #289 , #233 , #266 , #261 , #290 , #279 , #250 , #301 , #262 , #271 , #231 , #294 , #282 , #248 , #269 , #241 , #267 , #284 , #246 , #274 , #296 , #265 , #243 , #260 , #258 , #291 , #281 , #287 , #264 , #252 , #256 , #254 , #276 , #302 , #303 , #245 , #280 , #228 , #263 , #229 , #277 , #232 Sealed Document(s) - filed by Brian Fleishman, Breann Hudock, Eugene Mannacio, Ivan Villa Lara.(Cialkowski, David) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#309) SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 86 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG). (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#308) SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 85 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG). (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#307) SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 82 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG). (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#306) SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 80 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG). (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#305) SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 79 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG). (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
294 More Docket Entries
  • 05/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P., Bestbuy.com, LLC, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. re #9 Stipulation, Joint (Zamoff, Mitchell) (Entered: 05/26/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION JOINT by Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P., Bestbuy.com, LLC, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. Jointly Signed by Benjamin Hudock, Breann Hudock, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P., and Bestbuy.com, LLC. (Zamoff, Mitchell) (Entered: 05/26/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Mitchell Zamoff on behalf of Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P., Bestbuy.com, LLC, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Zamoff, Mitchell) (Entered: 05/26/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Benjamin Hudock, Breann Hudock. Bestbuy.com, LLC served on 5/12/2016, answer due 6/2/2016. (Cialkowski, David) (Entered: 05/17/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Benjamin Hudock, Breann Hudock. Best Buy Stores, L.P. served on 5/12/2016, answer due 6/2/2016. (Cialkowski, David) (Entered: 05/17/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Benjamin Hudock, Breann Hudock. Best Buy Co., Inc. served on 5/12/2016, answer due 6/2/2016. (Cialkowski, David) (Entered: 05/17/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Benjamin Hudock, Breann Hudock. LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. served on 5/17/2016, answer due 6/7/2016. (Cialkowski, David) (Entered: 05/17/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P., Bestbuy.com, LLC, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (kt) (Entered: 05/10/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • Docket(#2) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per Master List and referred to Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. Please use case number 16-cv-1220 JRT/FLN. (kt) (Entered: 05/10/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Best Buy Co. Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P., Bestbuy.com, LLC, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AMNDC-4919108.) Filed by Benjamin Hudock, Breann Hudock. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cialkowski, David) (Entered: 05/09/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less