This case was last updated from PACER on 12/09/2018 at 07:45:34 (UTC).

Houston v. Davenport et al (INMATE 1)

Case Summary

On 10/10/2018 Houston filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Davenport INMATE 1. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Charles S. Coody and Myron H. Thompson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00872

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Charles S. Coody

Presiding Judge

Myron H. Thompson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kenneth Houston

Bessemer, AL 35023-7299

Defendants

Clevon Randolph

Carter Davenport

Eddie Cook

Lynn Head

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) ORDER TO FILE SPECIAL REPORT AND ANSWER on ore before 12/18/2018; copies mailed to plf; mailed by CMRRR with #10 amended complaint & #16 amendment to the Dfts, General Counsel for the AL DOC, & General Counsel for the AL Board of Pardons & Paroles. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 11/6/2018. (alm, ) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

#11

(#11) ORDER: the court finds it appropriate to allow the #10 amended complaint to proceed on the claims presented therein seeking expungement of his disciplinary and scheduling of a new parole consideration hearing. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 10/26/2018. (alm, ) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

#21

(#21) ORDER ON MOTIONS denying #19 Motion to hold in abeyance and Motion for Verification of Counsel, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 11/21/18. (djy, ) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

16 #1

Exhibits 1-6

#9

(#9) Response to Order re #8 Order, by Kenneth Houston. (alm, ) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

#15

(#15) Return Receipt Card showing service of #12 Order signed by Kristi Simpson for AL DOC Interim General Counsel served on 10/31/2018. (alm, ) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

#19

(#19) MOTION for Temporary Abeyance and MOTION for Verification of Counsel by the Defendant by Kenneth Houston. (alm, ). (Entered: 11/19/2018)

#7

(#7) ORDER ON MOTION: ORDER granting #2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; Copies mailed to plf and account clerk at Donaldson CF. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 10/11/2018. (Furnished: Cashier via email on 11/6/18) (alm, ) Modified on 11/6/2018 (alm, ). (Entered: 10/11/2018)

#6

(#6) Case transferred in from Northern District of Alabama; Case Number 2:18-cv-1448-ACA-JEO; Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and certified docket sheet received ELECTRONICALLY via EMAIL from the Clerk. (alm, ) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

#18

(#18) Return Receipt Card showing service of #10 amended complaint, #16 amendment to complaint, & #17 order of procedure signed by (illegible) for Eddie Cook served on (no date given), answer due 12/18/2018. (djy, ). (Entered: 11/13/2018)

#12

(#12) ORDER: it is ORDERED that on or before 11/6/2018, Interim General Counsel for the AL DOC shall (i) provide the court with the last known address they have on record for Carter Davenport, OR (ii) advise the Court of whether Interim General Counsel or his designee will accept service and provide representation for this dft; DIRECTING the Clerk to provide a copy of this order via certified mail to Interim General Counsel for the AL DOC. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 10/26/2018. (Copy mailed CMRRR to AL DOC Interim General Counsel as directed)(alm, ) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

#10

(#10) AMENDED Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Eddie Cook, Carter Davenport, Lynn Head, filed by Kenneth Houston.(alm, ) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

#16

(#16) AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT, filed by Kenneth Houston. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-6)(alm, ) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

#14

(#14) Response to Order re #12 Order, by Gary Lee Willford, Jr. (Willford, Gary) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

#8

(#8) ORDER: it is ORDERED that on or before 10/29/2018, the plf shall file an amended complaint, as further set out in order; DIRECTING the Clerk to provide him with a copy of the form used by prisoners to file complaints, and the plf shall utilize this form in filing his amended complaint. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 10/11/2018. (Copy of inmate 1983 complaint form mailed to Plf as directed)(alm, ) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

#20

(#20) Return Receipt Card showing service of #10 Amended Complaint, #16 Amendment, & #17 Order signed by Kristi Simpson for Carter Davenport served on 11/14/2018, answer due 12/18/2018. (alm, ) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

#13

(#13) ORDER: it is ORDERED that on or before 11/6/2018, the plf shall file an amendment to his #10 amended complaint, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 10/26/2018. (alm, ) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ORDER ON MOTIONS denying #19 Motion to hold in abeyance and Motion for Verification of Counsel, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 11/21/18. (djy, ) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Return Receipt Card showing service of #10 Amended Complaint, #16 Amendment, & #17 Order signed by Kristi Simpson for Carter Davenport served on 11/14/2018, answer due 12/18/2018. (alm, ) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) MOTION for Temporary Abeyance and MOTION for Verification of Counsel by the Defendant by Kenneth Houston. (alm, ). (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Return Receipt Card showing service of #10 amended complaint, #16 amendment to complaint, & #17 order of procedure signed by (illegible) for Eddie Cook served on (no date given), answer due 12/18/2018. (djy, ). (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER TO FILE SPECIAL REPORT AND ANSWER on ore before 12/18/2018; copies mailed to plf; mailed by CMRRR with #10 amended complaint & #16 amendment to the Dfts, General Counsel for the AL DOC, & General Counsel for the AL Board of Pardons & Paroles. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 11/6/2018. (alm, ) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT, filed by Kenneth Houston. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-6)(alm, ) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Return Receipt Card showing service of #12 Order signed by Kristi Simpson for AL DOC Interim General Counsel served on 10/31/2018. (alm, ) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Response to Order re #12 Order, by Gary Lee Willford, Jr. (Willford, Gary) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER: it is ORDERED that on or before 11/6/2018, the plf shall file an amendment to his #10 amended complaint, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 10/26/2018. (alm, ) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER: it is ORDERED that on or before 11/6/2018, Interim General Counsel for the AL DOC shall (i) provide the court with the last known address they have on record for Carter Davenport, OR (ii) advise the Court of whether Interim General Counsel or his designee will accept service and provide representation for this dft; DIRECTING the Clerk to provide a copy of this order via certified mail to Interim General Counsel for the AL DOC. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 10/26/2018. (Copy mailed CMRRR to AL DOC Interim General Counsel as directed)(alm, ) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER: the court finds it appropriate to allow the #10 amended complaint to proceed on the claims presented therein seeking expungement of his disciplinary and scheduling of a new parole consideration hearing. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 10/26/2018. (alm, ) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) AMENDED Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Eddie Cook, Carter Davenport, Lynn Head, filed by Kenneth Houston.(alm, ) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Response to Order re #8 Order, by Kenneth Houston. (alm, ) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER: it is ORDERED that on or before 10/29/2018, the plf shall file an amended complaint, as further set out in order; DIRECTING the Clerk to provide him with a copy of the form used by prisoners to file complaints, and the plf shall utilize this form in filing his amended complaint. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 10/11/2018. (Copy of inmate 1983 complaint form mailed to Plf as directed)(alm, ) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER ON MOTION: ORDER granting #2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; Copies mailed to plf and account clerk at Donaldson CF. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 10/11/2018. (Furnished: Cashier via email on 11/6/18) (alm, ) Modified on 11/6/2018 (alm, ). (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Case transferred in from Northern District of Alabama; Case Number 2:18-cv-1448-ACA-JEO; Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and certified docket sheet received ELECTRONICALLY via EMAIL from the Clerk. (alm, ) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.