This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2020 at 15:12:15 (UTC).

Hospital Authority of Baxley et al v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 09/24/2018 Hospital Authority of Baxley filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Benjamin W. Cheesbro and Lisa G. Wood. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00115

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Benjamin W. Cheesbro

Presiding Judge

Lisa G. Wood

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Appling County

Hospital Authority of Baxley

Defendants

McKesson Corporation

Endo Health Solutions, Inc.

Purdue Pharma L.P.

Mallinckrodt LLC

Mallinckrodt PLC

Purdue Pharma, Inc.

Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.

Allergan PLC

Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Actavis LLC

Actavis Pharma, Inc.

Watson Laboratories, Inc.

Cephalon, Inc.

Cardinal Health Inc.

The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.

Johnson & Johnson

Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

W. Todd Harvey

Attorney at Burke, Harvey & Frankowski, LLC

One Highland Place, 2151 Highland Avenue, Suite 120

Birmingham, AL 35205

Jonathan Marigliano

Attorney at Prieto, Marigliano, Holbert & Prieto, LLC

Two Ravinia Drive, Suite 1330

Atlanta, GA 30346

Matthew S. Coles

Attorney at Coles Barton, LLP

150 South Perry Street, Suite 100

Lawrenceville, GA 30046

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) Case transferred to District of Northern District of Ohio, MDL. File Transferred Electronically. (slt) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

#2

(#2) RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 9/25/2018. (csr) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

1 #2

Complaint - without "TC" header

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Hospital Authority of Baxley and Appling County. $400.00 Filing Fee Paid - Receipt Number: 113J-2453019. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (csr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/25/2018: #2 Complaint - without "TC" header) (csr). (Entered: 09/25/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Case transferred to District of Northern District of Ohio, MDL. File Transferred Electronically. (slt) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 9/25/2018. (csr) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 113J-2453019. (csr) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Hospital Authority of Baxley and Appling County. $400.00 Filing Fee Paid - Receipt Number: 113J-2453019. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (csr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/25/2018: #2 Complaint - without "TC" header) (csr). (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less