This case was last updated from PACER on 12/14/2018 at 07:47:23 (UTC).

Horton v. Hood et al (INMATE 3)

Case Summary

On 10/15/2018 Horton filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Hood INMATE 3. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Charles S. Coody and W. Harold Albritton, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00886

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Charles S. Coody

Presiding Judge

W. Harold Albritton, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Zyrell Horton

Deatsville, AL 36022

Defendants

Steven T. Marshall

Patricia Hood

Ray D. Martin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Yvonne A. H. Saxon

Attorney at Alabama Attorney General's Office

501 Washington Avenue

Montgomery, AL 36130

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) RESPONSE TO #12 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Zyrell Horton. (dmn, ) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

#12

(#12) ORDERED that by December 6, 2018, Horton shall show cause why his 2254 petition should not be denied and this case dismissed as his petition was not filed within the one-year limitation period in 28 U.S.C. 2244(d). Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 11/16/2018. (kh, ) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Zyrell Horton. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents)(beh, ) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

#11

(#11) Supplemental Answer RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Patricia Hood, Steven T. Marshall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex-B-2 Transcript)(Saxon, Yvonne) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

1 #1

Supporting Documents

11 #1

Exhibit Ex-B-2 Transcript

#4

(#4) ORDER TO ANSWER habeas petition on or before November 7, 2018; Copy mailed to petitioner; mailed CMRRR w/copies of petition to Warden Patricia Hood & Attorney General for the State of Alabama. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 10/16/2018. (kh, ) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

#10

(#10) ORDERED that on or before November 16, 2018, Respondents shall file a supplemental answer addressing whether Petitioner's 2254 petition is time- barred under the one-year federal limitation period in 28 U.S.C. 2244(d). See court's Order, Doc. #4 , at 23 (stating that "the respondents should make specific reference to 28 U.S.C. 2244(d)"), as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 11/7/2018. (kh, ) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

9 #7

Exhibit Ex-C-2 State's Response

9 #6

Exhibit Ex-C-1 Horton' Rule 32 Petition

9 #4

Exhibit Ex-B-1 CCA COJ CR-11-0046

9 #5

Exhibit Ex-C Case Action Summary

9 #1

Exhibit EX-A CCA Decision CR-06-1268

9 #2

Exhibit Ex-A-1 COJ

9 #3

Exhibit Ex-B CCA Decision CR-11-0046

#9

(#9) RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Patricia Hood, Steven T. Marshall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX-A CCA Decision CR-06-1268, #2 Exhibit Ex-A-1 COJ, #3 Exhibit Ex-B CCA Decision CR-11-0046, #4 Exhibit Ex-B-1 CCA COJ CR-11-0046, #5 Exhibit Ex-C Case Action Summary, #6 Exhibit Ex-C-1 Horton' Rule 32 Petition, #7 Exhibit Ex-C-2 State's Response)(Saxon, Yvonne) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

#8

(#8) Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 complaint and #4 order of procedure signed by J. Taylor for Steven T. Marshall served on 10/22/2018, answer due 11/7/2018. (kh, ) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Yvonne A. H. Saxon on behalf of Patricia Hood, Steven T. Marshall (Saxon, Yvonne) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) RESPONSE TO #12 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Zyrell Horton. (dmn, ) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDERED that by December 6, 2018, Horton shall show cause why his 2254 petition should not be denied and this case dismissed as his petition was not filed within the one-year limitation period in 28 U.S.C. 2244(d). Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 11/16/2018. (kh, ) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Supplemental Answer RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Patricia Hood, Steven T. Marshall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex-B-2 Transcript)(Saxon, Yvonne) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDERED that on or before November 16, 2018, Respondents shall file a supplemental answer addressing whether Petitioner's 2254 petition is time- barred under the one-year federal limitation period in 28 U.S.C. 2244(d). See court's Order, Doc. #4 , at 23 (stating that "the respondents should make specific reference to 28 U.S.C. 2244(d)"), as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 11/7/2018. (kh, ) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Patricia Hood, Steven T. Marshall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX-A CCA Decision CR-06-1268, #2 Exhibit Ex-A-1 COJ, #3 Exhibit Ex-B CCA Decision CR-11-0046, #4 Exhibit Ex-B-1 CCA COJ CR-11-0046, #5 Exhibit Ex-C Case Action Summary, #6 Exhibit Ex-C-1 Horton' Rule 32 Petition, #7 Exhibit Ex-C-2 State's Response)(Saxon, Yvonne) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 complaint and #4 order of procedure signed by J. Taylor for Steven T. Marshall served on 10/22/2018, answer due 11/7/2018. (kh, ) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Yvonne A. H. Saxon on behalf of Patricia Hood, Steven T. Marshall (Saxon, Yvonne) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Patricia Hood, Steven T. Marshall. (Saxon, Yvonne) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 complaint and #4 order of procedure signed by Ina Beers for Patricia Hood served on 10/18/2018, answer due 11/7/2018. (kh, ) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER TO ANSWER habeas petition on or before November 7, 2018; Copy mailed to petitioner; mailed CMRRR w/copies of petition to Warden Patricia Hood & Attorney General for the State of Alabama. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 10/16/2018. (kh, ) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER: The petitioner's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #2 ) is hereby GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 10/16/2018. (kh, ) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Zyrell Horton. (beh, ) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Zyrell Horton. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents)(beh, ) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.