This case was last updated from PACER on 02/11/2019 at 07:44:28 (UTC).

Horne v. Atrium Medical Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 12/13/2018 Horne filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Atrium Medical Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Hampshire District. The Judge overseeing this case is Landya B. McCafferty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01164

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Hampshire District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Landya B. McCafferty

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Derrick Horne

Defendants

Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC

Atrium Medical Corporation

Getinge AB

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jon C. Conlin

Attorney at Cory Watson Attorneys

2131 Magnolia Ave South

Birmingham, AL 35205

Defendant Attorneys

Enjolique D. Aytch

Attorney at Akerman LLP

350 E Las Olas Blvd, Ste 1600

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Pierre A. Chabot

Attorney at Wadleigh Starr & Peters PLLC

95 Market St

Manchester, NH 03101

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Getinge AB, Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC, Atrium Medical Corporation by Getinge AB, Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC, Atrium Medical Corporation. Served/Mailed on 12/14/2018. Answer Follow Up on 2/15/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Aytch, Enjolique) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

3 #2

Exhibit Exhibit A

3 #1

Exhibit Subpoena

3 #1061

(#3) NOTICE of Subpoena by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Orent, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1745418 filed by Derrick Horne. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Conlin, Jon) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Subpoena by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Orent, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Getinge AB, Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC, Atrium Medical Corporation by Getinge AB, Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC, Atrium Medical Corporation. Served/Mailed on 12/14/2018. Answer Follow Up on 2/15/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Aytch, Enjolique) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ej) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-1164-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ej) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1745418 filed by Derrick Horne. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Conlin, Jon) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less