This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/12/2019 at 07:56:26 (UTC).

Hong v. The University of Michigan et al

Case Summary

On 12/14/2018 Hong filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against The University of Michigan. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Anthony P. Patti, Mark A. Goldsmith and R. Steven Whalen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-13907

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark A. Goldsmith

Referral Judges

Anthony P. Patti

R. Steven Whalen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Seong Hong

Defendants

The University of Michigan

Ann Lampkin-Williams

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David A. Nacht

Attorney at Nacht & Roumel, PC

101 N. Main Street, Suite 555

Ann Arbor, MI 48104

Amanda Michelle Ghannam

Attorney at Nacht and Roumel PC

34628 Navin Ct

Livonia, MI 48152

Charlotte Croson

Attorney at Nacht Law

101 North Main Street, Suite 555

Ann Arbor, MI 48104

Defendant Attorney

Timothy H. Howlett

Attorney at Dickinson Wright

500 Woodward Avenue, Suite 4000

Detroit, MI 48226-3425

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Michelle Ghannam on behalf of Seong Hong. (Ghannam, Amanda) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER Regarding Telephonic Scheduling Conference (TELEPHONIC Scheduling Conference set for 2/26/2019 11:00 AM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith.) Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (BGar) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by All Defendants. (Howlett, Timothy) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

#8

(#8) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by The University of Michigan (Howlett, Timothy) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

#7

(#7) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Timothy H. Howlett appearing on behalf of Ann Lampkin-Williams, The University of Michigan (Howlett, Timothy) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER of DISQUALIFICATION and REASSIGNING CASE from Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti to Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (SSch) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Charlotte Croson on behalf of Seong Hong. (Croson, Charlotte) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

#4

(#4) ORDER Regarding Certification Requirements. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Issued for *The University of Michigan* (SKra) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Issued for *Ann Lampkin-Williams* (SKra) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Seong Hong against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7031456 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Nacht, David) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Michelle Ghannam on behalf of Seong Hong. (Ghannam, Amanda) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER Regarding Telephonic Scheduling Conference (TELEPHONIC Scheduling Conference set for 2/26/2019 11:00 AM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith.) Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (BGar) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by All Defendants. (Howlett, Timothy) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by The University of Michigan (Howlett, Timothy) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Timothy H. Howlett appearing on behalf of Ann Lampkin-Williams, The University of Michigan (Howlett, Timothy) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER of DISQUALIFICATION and REASSIGNING CASE from Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti to Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (SSch) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Charlotte Croson on behalf of Seong Hong. (Croson, Charlotte) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER Regarding Certification Requirements. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Issued for *The University of Michigan* (SKra) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS Issued for *Ann Lampkin-Williams* (SKra) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Seong Hong against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7031456 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Nacht, David) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The University of Michigan is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy H. Howlett