This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2020 at 17:38:23 (UTC).

Hong v. Mortgage Research Center, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/26/2018 Hong filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against Mortgage Research Center, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert J. Krask and Henry C. Morgan, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00622

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Robert J. Krask

Presiding Judge

Henry C. Morgan, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

James Hong

Defendants

John Doe

Mortgage Research Center, LLC

Mortgage Research Center, LLC doing business as Veterans United Home Loans

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeremiah Andrew Denton, IV

Attorney at Jeremiah A. Denton III, P.C.

3300 South Building, Suite 208, 397 Little Neck Road

Virginia Beach, VA 23452

Jeremiah A. Denton, III

Attorney at Jeremiah A. Denton III, P.C.

3300 South Building, Suite 208, 397 Little Neck Road

Virginia Beach, VA 23452

Defendant Attorney

Thomas Joseph Moran

Attorney at Setliff Law PC

4940 Dominion Blvd

Glen Allen, VA 23060

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) Request for Hearing by Mortgage Research Center, LLC re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Amended Complaint) (Moran, Thomas) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

#11

(#11) REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Amended Complaint) filed by Mortgage Research Center, LLC. (Moran, Thomas) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

#10

(#10) Memorandum in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Amended Complaint) filed by James Hong. (Denton, Jeremiah) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

#9

(#9) Memorandum in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Amended Complaint) filed by Mortgage Research Center, LLC. (Moran, Thomas) (Entered: 12/31/2018)

#8

(#8) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Amended Complaint) by Mortgage Research Center, LLC. (Moran, Thomas) (Entered: 12/31/2018)

#7

(#7) Memorandum in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by James Hong. (Denton, Jeremiah) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

6 #4

Exhibit 4

6 #3

Exhibit 3

6 #2

Exhibit 2

6 #1

Exhibit 1

#6

(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by James Hong. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Denton, Jeremiah) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

#5

(#5) Memorandum in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Mortgage Research Center, LLC. (Moran, Thomas) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

#4

(#4) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Mortgage Research Center, LLC. (Moran, Thomas) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

#3

(#3) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Mortgage Research Center, LLC. (Moran, Thomas) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

#2

(#2) Magistrate Judge Notice and Judge's Information to counsel. (epri, ) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

#1

(#1) Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6378134.), filed by Mortgage Research Center, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moran, Thomas) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Request for Hearing by Mortgage Research Center, LLC re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Amended Complaint) (Moran, Thomas) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Amended Complaint) filed by Mortgage Research Center, LLC. (Moran, Thomas) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Memorandum in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Amended Complaint) filed by James Hong. (Denton, Jeremiah) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Memorandum in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Amended Complaint) filed by Mortgage Research Center, LLC. (Moran, Thomas) (Entered: 12/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Amended Complaint) by Mortgage Research Center, LLC. (Moran, Thomas) (Entered: 12/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Memorandum in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by James Hong. (Denton, Jeremiah) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by James Hong. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Denton, Jeremiah) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Memorandum in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Mortgage Research Center, LLC. (Moran, Thomas) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Mortgage Research Center, LLC. (Moran, Thomas) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Mortgage Research Center, LLC. (Moran, Thomas) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Magistrate Judge Notice and Judge's Information to counsel. (epri, ) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Correction re #1 Notice of Removal. A financial disclosure statement was not filed with the party's first appearance as required by Local Rule 7.1. The party is allowed seven (7) days to correct the deficiency and file the financial disclosure statement. Failure to file the financial disclosure statement within this period of time will subject #1 to being stricken from the record. (epri, ) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr and Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask. (epri, ) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6378134.), filed by Mortgage Research Center, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moran, Thomas) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less