Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 12/31/2018 at 07:46:55 (UTC).

HOLMES v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al

Case Summary

On 11/01/2018 HOLMES filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jane Magnus-Stinson and Mark J. Dinsmore. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00487

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jane Magnus-Stinson

Referral Judge

Mark J. Dinsmore

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MICHAEL LYNN HOLMES

Lewisburg, PA 17837

Defendants

J.E. KRUEGER

SHERMAN

LAMMER

KOONCE

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

PORTER

BUNDERRANT

THOMPSON

TINDALL

 

Court Documents

#29

(#29) RETURN of USM Service LAMMER served on 12/14/2018. (DMW) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

#28

(#28) RETURN of USM Service TINDALL served on 12/12/2018. (DMW) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

#27

(#27) RETURN of USM Service SHERMAN served on 12/12/2018. (DMW) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

#26

(#26) RETURN of USM Service THOMPSON served on 12/12/2018. (DMW) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

#25

(#25) RETURN of USM Service BUNDERRANT served on 12/12/2018. (DMW) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

#24

(#24) RETURN of USM Service J.E. KRUEGER served on 12/12/2018. (DMW) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

#23

(#23) RETURN of USM Service KOONCE served on 12/12/2018. (DMW) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

#22

(#22) RETURN of USM Service PORTER served on 12/12/2018. (DMW) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

21 #1

Envelope

3 #1

Exhibit Letter

2 #1

Exhibit

#2

(#6) Order Directing Further Proceedings - The plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis, dkt. #2 , is denied as presented. The Account Balance sheet that he submitted was printed on March 29, 2018, and it therefore does not reflect the transactions in the plaintiff's account for the period directly preceding the date he filed this case. He shall have until August 2, 2018, in which to renew his motion to proceed in forma pauperis by attaching a copy of the transactions associated with his institution trust account for the 6-month period preceding the filing of this action on June 26, 2018. Otherwise, the plaintiff must pay the $400.00 filing fee. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 7/3/2018. (NAD) (Entered: 07/03/2018)

1 #5

Envelope

1 #4

Proposed Summons

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#4) AFFIDAVIT in Support re #1 Complaint, filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL LYNN HOLMES. (HET) (Entered: 06/27/2018)

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) RETURN of USM Service LAMMER served on 12/14/2018. (DMW) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) RETURN of USM Service TINDALL served on 12/12/2018. (DMW) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) RETURN of USM Service SHERMAN served on 12/12/2018. (DMW) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) RETURN of USM Service THOMPSON served on 12/12/2018. (DMW) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) RETURN of USM Service BUNDERRANT served on 12/12/2018. (DMW) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) RETURN of USM Service J.E. KRUEGER served on 12/12/2018. (DMW) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) RETURN of USM Service KOONCE served on 12/12/2018. (DMW) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) RETURN of USM Service PORTER served on 12/12/2018. (DMW) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Submission of First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Lammer, filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL LYNN HOLMES. Docketed pursuant to Entry at #18 . (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DMW) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Submission of First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Krueger, filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL LYNN HOLMES. Docketed pursuant to Entry at #18 (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DMW) Modified on 12/11/2018 to edit docket text(DMW). (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ***PLEASE DISREGARD ENTERED IN ERROR***ENTRY DIRECTING REDOCKETING TO TERRE HAUTE DIVISION - This action concerns incidents that took place at the Federal Correctional Institution at Terre Haute, Indiana, which is located in the Southern District of Indiana, Terre Haute Division. See 28 U.S.C. 94(b)(2). This action was inadvertently docketed in the Indianapolis Division. Therefore, the clerk is directed to re-docket this action to the Terre Haute Division. Assignment of judicial officers to the re-docketed action shall be by random draw. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 11/1/2018.(NAD) Modified on 11/1/2018 (NAD). (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • (#9) RECEIPT #IP061930 for partial filing fee in the amount of $18.00, paid by Plaintiff. (DJH) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER - granting #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis, dkt. #7 , is granted to the extent that the plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of eighteen dollars ($18.00). The plaintiff shall have through September 4, 2018, in which to pay this sum to the clerk of the district court. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 8/7/2018. (NAD) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Renewed MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL LYNN HOLMES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Inmate Statement, #2 Envelope)(NAD) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Order Directing Further Proceedings - The plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis, dkt. #2 , is denied as presented. The Account Balance sheet that he submitted was printed on March 29, 2018, and it therefore does not reflect the transactions in the plaintiff's account for the period directly preceding the date he filed this case. He shall have until August 2, 2018, in which to renew his motion to proceed in forma pauperis by attaching a copy of the transactions associated with his institution trust account for the 6-month period preceding the filing of this action on June 26, 2018. Otherwise, the plaintiff must pay the $400.00 filing fee. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 7/3/2018. (NAD) (Entered: 07/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET) (Entered: 06/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AFFIDAVIT in Support re #1 Complaint, filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL LYNN HOLMES. (HET) (Entered: 06/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL LYNN HOLMES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter)(HET) (Entered: 06/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL LYNN HOLMES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(HET) Modified on 6/27/2018 (HET). (Entered: 06/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by MICHAEL LYNN HOLMES. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Envelope)(HET) (Entered: 06/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SHERMAN INDIVIDUALLY AND DOING BUSINESS AS DV FINANCIAL GROUP MARK is a litigant

Latest cases where Thompson Company, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where LAMMER is a litigant