This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2018 at 08:02:07 (UTC).

Holly v. Viasat, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/23/2018 Holly filed an Other lawsuit against Viasat, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Philip R. Lammens and James S. Moody, Jr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-00445

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Philip R. Lammens

Presiding Judge

James S. Moody, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christopher Holly

Ocklawaha, FL 32183

Defendant

Viasat, Inc.

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Christopher Holly. (Completed summons and copy of complaint provided) (LMF) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Christopher Holly. Related case(s): No (HAQ) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Viasat, Inc with Jury Demand filed by Christopher Holly.(LMF) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#7

(#7) ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice (Dkt. #6 ) is GRANTED. This cause is dismissed with prejudice. All pending motions are denied as moot. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 8/31/2018. (SMB) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

#3

(#3) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Issued by Deputy Clerk on 8/28/2018. (AD) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

#5

(#5) CONSENT to trial by U.S. Magistrate Judge by Christopher Holly. ***Signed by plaintiff only. (HAQ) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

#6

(#6) MOTION to Dismiss with prejudice by Christopher Holly. (HAQ) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice (Dkt. #6 ) is GRANTED. This cause is dismissed with prejudice. All pending motions are denied as moot. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 8/31/2018. (SMB) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Dismiss with prejudice by Christopher Holly. (HAQ) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CONSENT to trial by U.S. Magistrate Judge by Christopher Holly. ***Signed by plaintiff only. (HAQ) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Christopher Holly. Related case(s): No (HAQ) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Issued by Deputy Clerk on 8/28/2018. (AD) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Christopher Holly. (Completed summons and copy of complaint provided) (LMF) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Viasat, Inc with Jury Demand filed by Christopher Holly.(LMF) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less