This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2020 at 14:29:12 (UTC).

Holding One, Inc. v. Pro One LLC

Case Summary

On 08/30/2018 Holding One, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Pro One LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr and Brian A. Jackson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00806

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr

Presiding Judge

Brian A. Jackson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Holding One, Inc.

Defendants

Pro One LLC

Pro One LLC doing business as Pro One Corp formerly known as Property One Group, LLC

Property One Group, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Brent Hicks

Attorney at McGlinchey Stafford- B.R.

One American Place, 301 Main Street, 14Th Floor

Baton Rouge, LA 70801

Defendant Attorney

Sandra Destin Sims

201 Nw Railroad, Post Office Box 1537

Hammond, LA 70404

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) STATUS REPORT by Holding One, Inc.. (Hicks, Michael) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

#11

(#11) MEMORANDUM in Support of #10 MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by Pro One LLC. (Sims, Sandra) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

#10

(#10) MOTION to Set Aside Default by Pro One LLC. (Sims, Sandra) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Pro One LLC.(Sims, Sandra) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

#7

(#7) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 11/8/2018 at 11:15 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 10/25/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 9/26/2018. (JSL) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

6 #2

Proposed Pleading; Clerk's Entry of Default

6 #1

Exhibit A

#6

(#6) MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Pro One LLC, d/b/a Pro One Corp formerly named Property One Group, LLC by Holding One, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Pleading; Clerk's Entry of Default)(Hicks, Michael) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Holding One, Inc.. Pro One LLC served on 9/4/2018, answer due 9/25/2018. (Hicks, Michael) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (SGO) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

#2

(#2) Summons Submitted (Hicks, Michael) Modified on 8/30/2018 to flatten document (SGO). (Entered: 08/30/2018)

1 #4

Attachment Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Pro One d/b/a Pro One Corp formerly named Property One Group, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1824220.), filed by Holding One, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(Hicks, Michael) Modified on 8/30/2018 to flatten documents (SGO). (Entered: 08/30/2018)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STATUS REPORT by Holding One, Inc.. (Hicks, Michael) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MEMORANDUM in Support of #10 MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by Pro One LLC. (Sims, Sandra) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Set Aside Default by Pro One LLC. (Sims, Sandra) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Pro One LLC.(Sims, Sandra) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Pro One LLC (EDC) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 11/8/2018 at 11:15 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 10/25/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 9/26/2018. (JSL) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Pro One LLC, d/b/a Pro One Corp formerly named Property One Group, LLC by Holding One, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Pleading; Clerk's Entry of Default)(Hicks, Michael) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Holding One, Inc.. Pro One LLC served on 9/4/2018, answer due 9/25/2018. (Hicks, Michael) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Pro One LLC. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (SGO) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (SGO) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Submitted (Hicks, Michael) Modified on 8/30/2018 to flatten document (SGO). (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Pro One d/b/a Pro One Corp formerly named Property One Group, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1824220.), filed by Holding One, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(Hicks, Michael) Modified on 8/30/2018 to flatten documents (SGO). (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less