This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2020 at 18:32:10 (UTC).

Hittler et al v. Johnson & Johnson, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/12/2018 Hittler filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Johnson Johnson, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lois H. Goodman and Freda L. Wolfson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-17106

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Lois H. Goodman

Presiding Judge

Freda L. Wolfson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Dana Root

Hector Calvario

Juana Guerrero

Patricia Ann Brown

CRYSTAL MORGAN

Velta Jones

Cheryl Fowler

Eileen Wilhelm

Matthew Roe

JAMES DONOHUE

Kristi Marie Shepherd

Nikita Adams

Lothar Meyer

Pamela Y Williams

Audria Bell

Carol Shepherd

Kimberly Abney

Brent Wallingsford

Warnick Allen, Jr,

Defendant

PTI Union, LLC

52 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

110 E. Lockwood

St. Louis, MO 63119

WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

110 E. Lockwood, 2Nd Floor

St. Louis, MO 63119

JAMES G. ONDER

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

110 E. Lockwood

St. Louis, MO 63119

Defendant Attorneys

CAROLINE M. TINSLEY

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

100 South Fourth Street, Suite 600

St. Louis, MO 63102

JANET LYNN POLETTO

Attorney at HARDIN, KUNDLA, MCKEON, POLETTO & POLIFRONI, PC

673 Morris Avenue, Po Box 730

Springfield, NJ 07081-0730

Other Attorneys

Steven Thomas Walsh

Attorney at SANDBERG PHOENIX, P.C.

600 Washington Ave., 15Th Floor

St. Louis, MO 63101-1313

MARY ANNE MELLOW

Attorney at SANDBERG AND PHOENIX

One City Centre, 15Th Floor

St. Louis, MO 63101-1880

MARK A. PROST

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

One City Centre, 15Th Floor, 515 North Sixth Street

St. Louis, MO 63101-1880

Beth A. Bauer

Attorney at HeplerBroom LLC - Edwardsville

130 North Main Street, P.O. Box 510

Edwardsville, IL 62025

SCOTT A. JAMES

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

600 Travis Street, Suite 3400

Houston, TX 77002-2926

KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

600 Travis Ste 3400

Houston, TX 77002

MARK K. SILVER

Attorney at COUGHLIN DUFFY LLP

350 Mount Kemble Avenue, Po Box 1917

Morristown, NJ 07962-1917

 

Court Documents

98 #4

Text of Proposed Order

98 #3

Exhibit A

98 #2

Certification of Mark K. Silver, Esq.

98 #1

Brief in Support of Imerys' Motion to Seal Certain Portions of Imerys'

#98

(#98) MOTION to Seal Certain Portions of Imerys' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by IMERYS TALC AMERICA INC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Imerys' Motion to Seal Certain Portions of Imerys' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, #2 Certification of Mark K. Silver, Esq., #3 Exhibit A, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(SILVER, MARK) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

97 #4

Text of Proposed Order

97 #3

Exhibit A

97 #2

Certification of Mark K. Silver, Esq.

#97

(#97) MOTION to Seal Certain Portions of Imerys' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims based on Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by IMERYS TALC AMERICA INC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Imerys' Motion to Seal Certain Portions of Imerys' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims based on Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #2 Certification of Mark K. Silver, Esq., #3 Exhibit A, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(SILVER, MARK) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #7

Exhibit Exhibit 7 - PTI Consent

1 #6

Exhibit Exhibit 6 - Imery's Consent

1 #5

Exhibit Exhibit 5 - State Court File

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Decker Affidavit

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Decl of Tarrasch

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Decl of Noland

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1 - First Amended Petition

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, case number 18JE-CC00448, with receipt number 0865-6728635, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Johnson & Johnson, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - First Amended Petition, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Decl of Noland, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Decl of Tarrasch, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Decker Affidavit, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - State Court File, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - Imery's Consent, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - PTI Consent, #8 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form)(Bauer, Beth) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

287 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #98 MOTION to Seal Certain Portions of Imerys' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, #97 MOTION to Seal Certain Portions of Imerys' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims based on Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. Motions set for 3/4/2019 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#98) MOTION to Seal Certain Portions of Imerys' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by IMERYS TALC AMERICA INC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Imerys' Motion to Seal Certain Portions of Imerys' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, #2 Certification of Mark K. Silver, Esq., #3 Exhibit A, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(SILVER, MARK) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#97) MOTION to Seal Certain Portions of Imerys' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims based on Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by IMERYS TALC AMERICA INC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Imerys' Motion to Seal Certain Portions of Imerys' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims based on Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #2 Certification of Mark K. Silver, Esq., #3 Exhibit A, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(SILVER, MARK) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Set Deadlines as to #90 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Motion set for 3/4/2019 before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#96) REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by PTI Union, LLC re #74 MOTION to Sever Defendant PTI Union, LLC's Renewed Motion to Sever Claims : Defendant PTI Union, LLC's Reply in Support of its Renewed Motion to Sever Claims (TINSLEY, CAROLINE) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#95) REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by PTI Union, LLC re #73 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant PTI Union, LLC's Renewed Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Petition for Failure to State a Claim : Reply in Support of Defendant PTI Union, LLC's Renewed Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (TINSLEY, CAROLINE) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#94) REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by PTI Royston, LLC re #70 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : Renewed Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim : Reply in Support of Specially-Appearing Defendant PTI Royston, LLC's Renewed Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim (TINSLEY, CAROLINE) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#93) Letter from Caroline M. Tinsley to Hon. Freda L. Wolfson re Specially-Appearing Defendant PTI Royston, LLC and Defendant PTI Union, LLC's Joinder in Opposing Remand re #92 Memorandum in Opposition of Motion,. (TINSLEY, CAROLINE) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#92) MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON INC. re #66 MOTION to Remand to the Circuit Court for the Twenty-Third Judicial Circuit, Jefferson County, Missouri (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Certificate of Service)(SHARKO, SUSAN) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#91) Exhibit to #90 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, by IMERYS TALC AMERICA INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F, #2 Exhibit G, #3 Exhibit H, #4 Exhibit J, #5 Exhibit K, #6 Exhibit L, #7 Exhibit M, #8 Exhibit N)(SILVER, MARK)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court. (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
96 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc... (Bauer, Beth) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Johnson & Johnson, Inc... (Bauer, Beth) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #7 MOTION to Stay filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Rea Order, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Phillips Order)(Bauer, Beth) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Stay by Defendants Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc.. (Bauer, Beth) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to Complaint by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc..(Bauer, Beth) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Elberg Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Son Affidavit, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - List of Plaintiffs)(Bauer, Beth) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by Defendants Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc.. (Bauer, Beth) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation Their Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc.. (Bauer, Beth) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Bauer, Beth) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, case number 18JE-CC00448, with receipt number 0865-6728635, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Johnson & Johnson, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - First Amended Petition, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Decl of Noland, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Decl of Tarrasch, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Decker Affidavit, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - State Court File, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - Imery's Consent, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - PTI Consent, #8 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form)(Bauer, Beth) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARK K. SILVER

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCOTT A. JAMES

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER