This case was last updated from PACER on 09/03/2018 at 07:40:27 (UTC).

Hitachi Automotive Systems Americas, Inc. v. TI Automotive Ligonier Corporation

Case Summary

On 07/05/2018 Hitachi Automotive Systems Americas, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TI Automotive Ligonier Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Joseph M. Hood. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-00438

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph M. Hood

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Hitachi Automotive Systems Americas, Inc.

Defendant and Counter Claimant

TI Automotive Ligonier Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Michael G. Latiff

Attorney at McDonald Hopkins, PLC - MI

39533 Woodward Avenue, Suite 318

Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304

John A. Gambill

Attorney at McDonald Hopkins LLC - Columbus

250 West Street, Suite 550

Columbus, OH 43215

W. Craig Robertson, III

Attorney at Wyatt, Tarrant & Combs LLP - Lexington

250 W. Main Street, Suite 1600

Lexington, KY 40507

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Peter Matthew Cummins

Attorney at Frost Brown Todd LLC - Louisville

400 W. Market Street, Suite 3200

Louisville, KY 40202

Scott T. Seabolt

Attorney at Seabolt Law Firm

17199 N. Laurel Park Drive, Suite 215

Livonia, MI 48152

 

Court Documents

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

4 #2

Proposed Order

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - PO Summary

1 #6

Exhibit 6 - Hitachi Demand Letter

4 #1

Memorandum in Support

#4

(#4) MOTION for Temporary, Preliminary, and Permanent Injunctive Relief by Hitachi Automotive Systems Americas, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(JJ). Added MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Permanent Injunction on 7/11/2018 (STC). (Entered: 07/06/2018)

#3

(#3) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hitachi Automotive Systems Americas, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Hitachi America, Ltd. for Hitachi Automotive Systems Americas, Inc. (JJ) (Entered: 07/06/2018)

1 #7

Exhibit 7 - TI Automotive Response Letter dated 7-3-18

1 #5

Exhibit 5 - TI Automotive Termination Letter

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4113000), filed by Hitachi Automotive Systems Americas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Requirements Contract, #2 Exhibit 2 - PO Summary, #3 Exhibit 3 - Terms and Conditions of Purchase, #4 Exhibit 4 - DCA Surcharge History, #5 Exhibit 5 - TI Automotive Termination Letter, #6 Exhibit 6 - Hitachi Demand Letter, #7 Exhibit 7 - TI Automotive Response Letter dated 7-3-18, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Summons TI Automotive)(JJ) (Entered: 07/06/2018)

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - Terms and Conditions of Purchase

1 #4

Exhibit 4 - DCA Surcharge History

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to TI Automotive Ligonier Corporation; Summons issued and returned to counsel by pick-up from clerk's office by Secretary of State. (JJ) Modified on 7/6/2018 (JJ). (Entered: 07/06/2018)

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Requirements Contract

1 #9

Summons TI Automotive

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Joseph M. Hood for review: re #4 MOTION Temporary, Preliminary, and Permanent Injuctive by Hitachi Automotive Systems Americas, Inc. (JJ) (Entered: 07/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to TI Automotive Ligonier Corporation; Summons issued and returned to counsel by pick-up from clerk's office by Secretary of State. (JJ) Modified on 7/6/2018 (JJ). (Entered: 07/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Temporary, Preliminary, and Permanent Injunctive Relief by Hitachi Automotive Systems Americas, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(JJ). Added MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Permanent Injunction on 7/11/2018 (STC). (Entered: 07/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hitachi Automotive Systems Americas, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Hitachi America, Ltd. for Hitachi Automotive Systems Americas, Inc. (JJ) (Entered: 07/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4113000), filed by Hitachi Automotive Systems Americas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Requirements Contract, #2 Exhibit 2 - PO Summary, #3 Exhibit 3 - Terms and Conditions of Purchase, #4 Exhibit 4 - DCA Surcharge History, #5 Exhibit 5 - TI Automotive Termination Letter, #6 Exhibit 6 - Hitachi Demand Letter, #7 Exhibit 7 - TI Automotive Response Letter dated 7-3-18, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Summons TI Automotive)(JJ) (Entered: 07/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.