This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2020 at 16:47:18 (UTC).

Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc. v. Bordenave et al

Case Summary

On 11/02/2018 Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Bordenave. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Paul A. Engelmayer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-10222

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul A. Engelmayer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc.

Defendants

ATK Entertainment, Inc.

Business Moves Consulting, Inc.

Khaled M. Khaled

Curtis Bordenave

Business Moves Consulting, Inc. doing business as Business Moves

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Laura B Dowgin

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor (Broadway)

45 Broadway Atrium, Suite 1600

New York, NY 10006

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: Pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(l)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiff Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc. hereby voluntarily dismisses all claims brought in this action against Defendants Khaled M. Khaled and ATK Entertainment, Inc. only. Such dismissal is with prejudice and without costs to any party. SO ORDERED. ATK Entertainment, Inc. and Khaled M. Khaled terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 12/28/2018) (jca) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

#14

(#14) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) ATK Entertainment, Inc., Khaled M. Khaled. Document filed by Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).. (Dowgin, Laura) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

#13

(#13) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #12 Letter filed by Curtis Bordenave. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. Defendant shall file his answer or other responsive pleading on January 19, 2019. SO ORDERED.(Curtis Bordenave answer due 1/19/2019.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 12/20/2018) (anc) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

#12

(#12) LETTER from Curtis Bordenave, dated 12/12/18 re: Defendant Curtis Bordenave requests that the Court grant a 30-day extension of time to respond/reply/answer or otherwise plead in this action etc. Document filed by Curtis Bordenave.(sc) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

#11

(#11) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Curtis Bordenave served on 11/28/2018, answer due 12/19/2018. Service was accepted by Curtis Bordenave. Document filed by Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc.. (Dowgin, Laura) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

#10

(#10) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 9 FRCP Rule 5d Memo - Sent to Chambers. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. The Court extends, nunc pro tune, the deadline for defendant Business Moves Consulting, Inc. to file an answer or other responsive pleading to December 31, 2018. The party is advised that all future filings must be submitted by counsel. SO ORDERED. (Business Moves Consulting, Inc. answer due 12/31/2018.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 12/4/2018) (jca) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

#8

(#8) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Business Moves Consulting, Inc. served on 11/9/2018, answer due 11/30/2018. Service was accepted by Mark Charles Pampley III. Document filed by Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc.. (Dowgin, Laura) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

#7

(#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Curtis Bordenave, Business Moves Consulting, Inc.. (sj) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

#6

(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to ATK Entertainment, Inc., Khaled M. Khaled. (sj) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

#5

(#5) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent ALTOHA, Inc. for Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc.. Document filed by Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc..(Dowgin, Laura) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Khaled M. Khaled and ATK Entertainment, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc.. (Dowgin, Laura) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

1 #7

Exhibit Exhibit G

1 #6

Exhibit Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against ATK Entertainment, Inc., Curtis Bordenave, Business Moves Consulting, Inc., Khaled M. Khaled. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15854866)Document filed by Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G)(Dowgin, Laura) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: Pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(l)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiff Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc. hereby voluntarily dismisses all claims brought in this action against Defendants Khaled M. Khaled and ATK Entertainment, Inc. only. Such dismissal is with prejudice and without costs to any party. SO ORDERED. ATK Entertainment, Inc. and Khaled M. Khaled terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 12/28/2018) (jca) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #14 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (dt) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) ATK Entertainment, Inc., Khaled M. Khaled. Document filed by Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).. (Dowgin, Laura) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #12 Letter filed by Curtis Bordenave. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. Defendant shall file his answer or other responsive pleading on January 19, 2019. SO ORDERED.(Curtis Bordenave answer due 1/19/2019.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 12/20/2018) (anc) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) LETTER from Curtis Bordenave, dated 12/12/18 re: Defendant Curtis Bordenave requests that the Court grant a 30-day extension of time to respond/reply/answer or otherwise plead in this action etc. Document filed by Curtis Bordenave.(sc) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Curtis Bordenave served on 11/28/2018, answer due 12/19/2018. Service was accepted by Curtis Bordenave. Document filed by Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc.. (Dowgin, Laura) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 9 FRCP Rule 5d Memo - Sent to Chambers. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. The Court extends, nunc pro tune, the deadline for defendant Business Moves Consulting, Inc. to file an answer or other responsive pleading to December 31, 2018. The party is advised that all future filings must be submitted by counsel. SO ORDERED. (Business Moves Consulting, Inc. answer due 12/31/2018.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 12/4/2018) (jca) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Business Moves Consulting, Inc. served on 11/9/2018, answer due 11/30/2018. Service was accepted by Mark Charles Pampley III. Document filed by Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc.. (Dowgin, Laura) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Curtis Bordenave, Business Moves Consulting, Inc.. (sj) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to ATK Entertainment, Inc., Khaled M. Khaled. (sj) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • Case Designated ECF. (sj) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Laura B Dowgin. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (sj) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent ALTOHA, Inc. for Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc.. Document filed by Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc..(Dowgin, Laura) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Khaled M. Khaled and ATK Entertainment, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc.. (Dowgin, Laura) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Curtis Bordenave and Business Moves Consulting, Inc., d/b/a Business Moves, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc.. (Dowgin, Laura) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Dowgin, Laura) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against ATK Entertainment, Inc., Curtis Bordenave, Business Moves Consulting, Inc., Khaled M. Khaled. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15854866)Document filed by Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G)(Dowgin, Laura) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Business Moves Consulting is a litigant

Latest cases where Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Laura B Dowgin