This case was last updated from PACER on 12/28/2018 at 08:12:35 (UTC).

Hill-El v. Johnson et al

Case Summary

On 10/29/2018 Hill-El filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Johnson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Joseph H L Perez-Montes and Dee D Drell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01411

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Joseph H L Perez-Montes

Presiding Judge

Dee D Drell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Antoine Martwain Hill-El

Pollock, LA 71467

Defendants

Hodges

A Howard

Warden Stancil

Calvin Johnson

R Gotreaux

J Dickson

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. IT IS RECOMMENDED that #1 Complaint be DENIED AND DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Objections to R&R due by 1/2/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 12/19/2018. (crt,Tice, Y)(a) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

#12

(#12) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial Filing Fee due in the amount of $100.81. It is further ordered that plaintiff make payments of 20 percent of income for preceding month until $350.00 has been paid in full. Clerk manually noticed Prison Accounts Officer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 11/30/2018. (crt,ThomasSld, T) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#11

(#11) PROPOSED ORDER re #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Haik, K) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

10 #3

Envelope

10 #2

Exhibits

10 #1

Affidavit

#10

(#10) CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Accounts officer page filed by Antoine Martwain Hill-El regarding #6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibits, #3 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

9 #1

Envelope

#9

(#9) AFFIDAVIT of Truth/MEMORANDUM in Support by Antoine Martwain Hill-El re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

8 #2

Envelope

8 #1

Exhibits

6 #1

Envelope

#6

(#6) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Antoine Martwain Hill-El. (Accounts officer page incompleted. Clerk resent with a note stating it must be completed.) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K) Modified to reflect pleading as deficient on 11/13/2018 (Haik, K). Modified to remove deficiency notation on 11/28/2018 (Haik, K). (Entered: 11/13/2018)

1 #4

Envelope

1 #3

Proposed summons/writ

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Civil cover sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against J Dickson, R Gotreaux, Hodges, A Howard, Calvin Johnson, Stancil filed by Antoine Martwain Hill-El. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed summons/writ, #4 Envelope)(crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. IT IS RECOMMENDED that #1 Complaint be DENIED AND DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Objections to R&R due by 1/2/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 12/19/2018. (crt,Tice, Y)(a) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial Filing Fee due in the amount of $100.81. It is further ordered that plaintiff make payments of 20 percent of income for preceding month until $350.00 has been paid in full. Clerk manually noticed Prison Accounts Officer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 11/30/2018. (crt,ThomasSld, T) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) PROPOSED ORDER re #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Haik, K) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Accounts officer page filed by Antoine Martwain Hill-El regarding #6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibits, #3 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) AFFIDAVIT of Truth/MEMORANDUM in Support by Antoine Martwain Hill-El re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AFFIDAVIT of Truth/Exhibits to IFP application by Antoine Martwain Hill-El. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AFFIDAVIT/EXHIBITS re #1 Complaint by Antoine Martwain Hill-El. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Antoine Martwain Hill-El. (Accounts officer page incompleted. Clerk resent with a note stating it must be completed.) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K) Modified to reflect pleading as deficient on 11/13/2018 (Haik, K). Modified to remove deficiency notation on 11/28/2018 (Haik, K). (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit filing fee or a completed IFP application. Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 11/30/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 10/31/2018. (Attachments: #1 ifp form)(crt,Haik, K) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • (#4) ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 10/31/2018. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Thigpen, M) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DEFICIENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Antoine Martwain Hill-El. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Miletello, A) Application not on approved forms. (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against J Dickson, R Gotreaux, Hodges, A Howard, Calvin Johnson, Stancil filed by Antoine Martwain Hill-El. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed summons/writ, #4 Envelope)(crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less