This case was last updated from PACER on 11/17/2018 at 07:41:17 (UTC).

High v. Social Security Administration

Case Summary

On 09/18/2018 High filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Social Security Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kimberly E. West and Ronald A. White. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:18-CV-00317

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kimberly E. West

Presiding Judge

Ronald A. White

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Veronica L. High

Defendant

Social Security Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Davis Duty

Attorney at Duty and Duty Law Firm

909 S 20Th St

Fort Smith, AR 72901

 

Court Documents

#9

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party. ( Filing Fee due by 9/25/2018)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#1

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE of Complaint re: Social Security Administration Summons (Re: #2 Social Security Complaint) by Veronica L. High (Duty, Davis) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Social Security Administration - U. S. Attorney (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Social Security Administration - Regional Counsel (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • (#6) MINUTE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White, referring case to Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West for all further proceedings in accordance with jurisdiction pursuant to 28 USC 636. All future filings shall bear the case number 18-cv-317-RAW-KEW. (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MINUTE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White: Granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis(acg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Veronica L. High Responses due by 10/2/2018(Duty, Davis) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party. ( Filing Fee due by 9/25/2018)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration by Veronica L. High (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Veronica L. High (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.