This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/06/2018 at 05:45:49 (UTC).

Higgins et al v. Kentucky Sports Radio LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/05/2018 Higgins filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Kentucky Sports Radio LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Joseph M. Hood. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-00043

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph M. Hood

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Carol Higgins

Weatherguard, Inc.

John M. Higgins

Defendants

Matthew H. Jones

Drew Franklin

Kentucky Sports Radio, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Carol A. Svolos

Attorney at KUTAK, ROCK LAW FIRM - OMAHA

1650 Farnam Street

Omaha, NE 68102-2186

John P. Passarelli

Attorney at KUTAK, ROCK LAW FIRM - OMAHA

1650 Farnam Street

Omaha, NE 68102-2186

Kimberly M. Hare

Attorney at KUTAK, ROCK LAW FIRM - CHICAGO

One South Wacker Drive, Suite 3910

Chicago, IL 60606

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel J. Fischer

Attorney at KOLEY, JESSEN LAW FIRM

1125 South 103Rd Street, Suite 800, One Pacific Place

Omaha, NE 68124

Michael C. Cox

Attorney at KOLEY, JESSEN LAW FIRM

1125 South 103Rd Street, Suite 800, One Pacific Place

Omaha, NE 68124

 

Court Documents

21 #1

*Restricted*

#21

#20

19 #1

Exhibit Declaration of Michael C. Cox

#19

#18

17 #2

Exhibit A

17 #1

Affidavit John Passarelli

#17

#13

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#4

#2

#1

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2018
  • Conflict Check run. (STC) (Entered: 02/05/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Nebraska. Case number 8:17-cv-00367. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. cc: COR w/ docket sheet (Entered: 02/05/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • Case transferred to Eastern District of Kentucky. Original electronic file sent. (JSF) [Transferred from ned on 2/5/2018.] (Entered: 02/05/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, Alternatively, Motion to Transfer Venue (Filing No. #13 ) is granted in part and denied in part. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1631, and in the interests of justice, this matter shall be transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky. The Clerk of the Court is directed to take all necessary steps to transfer this matter. Ordered by Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (JSF) [Transferred from ned on 2/5/2018.] (Entered: 01/05/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) INDEX in support of MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Alternatively, for Change of Venue #13 by Attorney Michael C. Cox on behalf of Defendant Kentucky Sports Radio LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Michael C. Cox)(Cox, Michael) [Transferred from ned on 2/5/2018.] (Entered: 12/11/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) REPLY BRIEF in support of MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Alternatively, for Change of Venue #13 by Attorney Michael C. Cox on behalf of Defendant Kentucky Sports Radio LLC.(Cox, Michael) [Transferred from ned on 2/5/2018.] (Entered: 12/11/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) INDEX in support of Brief, #16 by Attorney John P. Passarelli on behalf of Plaintiffs Carol Higgins, John M. Higgins, Weatherguard, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit John Passarelli, #2 Exhibit A)(Passarelli, John) [Transferred from ned on 2/5/2018.] (Entered: 12/04/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) BRIEF in opposition to MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Alternatively, for Change of Venue #13 by Attorney John P. Passarelli on behalf of Plaintiffs Carol Higgins, John M. Higgins, Weatherguard, Inc..(Passarelli, John) [Transferred from ned on 2/5/2018.] (Entered: 12/04/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) INDEX in support of MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Alternatively, for Change of Venue #13 by Attorney Michael C. Cox on behalf of Defendants Drew Franklin, Matthew H. Jones, Kentucky Sports Radio LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - Affidavit of Matthew Jones, #2 Ex. B - Affidavit of Drew Franklin, #3 Ex. C - Affidavit of Andrew Jefferson)(Cox, Michael) [Transferred from ned on 2/5/2018.] (Entered: 11/13/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) BRIEF in support of MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Alternatively, for Change of Venue #13 by Attorney Michael C. Cox on behalf of Defendants Drew Franklin, Matthew H. Jones, Kentucky Sports Radio LLC.(Cox, Michael) [Transferred from ned on 2/5/2018.] (Entered: 11/13/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Michael C. Cox on behalf of Defendant Kentucky Sports Radio LLC.(Cox, Michael) [Transferred from ned on 2/5/2018.] (Entered: 10/23/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Matthew H. Jones on 10/14/2017. (Passarelli, John) [Transferred from ned on 2/5/2018.] (Entered: 10/18/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney John P. Passarelli on behalf of Plaintiff Weatherguard, Inc..(Passarelli, John) [Transferred from ned on 2/5/2018.] (Entered: 10/18/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Kentucky Sports Radio LLC on 10/10/2017. (Passarelli, John) [Transferred from ned on 2/5/2018.] (Entered: 10/12/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Drew Franklin on 10/4/2017. (Passarelli, John) [Transferred from ned on 2/5/2018.] (Entered: 10/11/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • (#5) TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Weatherguard, Inc.. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LAC) [Transferred from ned on 2/5/2018.] (Entered: 10/03/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to defendant Drew Franklin, Matthew H. Jones, and Kentucky Sports Radio LLC. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LAC) [Transferred from ned on 2/5/2018.] (Entered: 10/03/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • (#3) TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. (LAC) [Transferred from ned on 2/5/2018.] (Entered: 10/03/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Requested as to regarding Complaint, #1 . (Passarelli, John) [Transferred from ned on 2/5/2018.] (Entered: 10/03/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Drew Franklin, Matthew H. Jones, Kentucky Sports Radio LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0867-3536366), by Attorney John P. Passarelli on behalf of John M Higgins, Weatherguard, Inc., Carol Higgins(Passarelli, John) [Transferred from ned on 2/5/2018.] (Entered: 10/03/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WEATHERGUARD, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel J Fischer

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael C. Cox