This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2018 at 08:02:57 (UTC).

HICKMAN v. OVERMYER et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2018 HICKMAN filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against OVERMYER. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert C. Mitchell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-01144

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert C. Mitchell

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ROBIN HICKMAN

Respondents

JOSHUA SHAPIRO

STEPHEN A. ZAPPALA

MICHAEL OVERMYER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Rachael Santoriella

100 Ross Street, Suite 1

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Respondent Attorney

Emily B. Grawe

Attorney at Allegheny County District Attorneys Office

436 Grant Street, No 401

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) First MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by ROBIN HICKMAN. (Santoriella, Rachael) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Emily B. Grawe on behalf of MICHAEL OVERMYER, JOSHUA SHAPIRO, STEPHEN A. ZAPPALA. (Grawe, Emily) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $5, receipt number 0315-4838063), filed by ROBIN HICKMAN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jv) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

#4

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) AMENDED DOCUMENT by ROBIN HICKMAN. Amendment to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. "Document previously filed electronically" (ksa) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Emily B. Grawe on behalf of MICHAEL OVERMYER, JOSHUA SHAPIRO, STEPHEN A. ZAPPALA. (Grawe, Emily) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #4 Brief in Support of Motion. ERROR: Wrong event selected. CORRECTION: Re-docketed as Amended document. This message is for informational purposes only. (ksa) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AMENDED DOCUMENT by ROBIN HICKMAN. Amendment to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. "Document previously filed electronically" (ksa) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) BRIEF in Support re #2 Motion to Amend/Correct filed by ROBIN HICKMAN. (Santoriella, Rachael) Modified on 10/4/2018 ERROR: Wrong event selected. Document removed from public view and refiled by Court. (ksa) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER granting in part and denying in part #2 Motion to Amend/Correct. Amended petition to be filed on or before October 4, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert C. Mitchell on 09/04/2018. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (Mitchell, Robert) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) First MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by ROBIN HICKMAN. (Santoriella, Rachael) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $5, receipt number 0315-4838063), filed by ROBIN HICKMAN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jv) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less