This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2020 at 18:40:12 (UTC).

Hickman v. Assurant, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/19/2018 Hickman filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Assurant, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Andrew G. Schopler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-02851

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Courthouse:

    California Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cathy Ann Bencivengo

Referral Judge

Andrew G. Schopler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dale Hickman

Defendants

Assurant, Inc.

Does 1 Through 10

The Warranty Group

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jason N. Black

Attorney at Black + Deen LLP

1620 5Th Ave., Suite 875

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorneys

Brian Patrick Long

Attorney at Seyfarth Shawll LLP

601 South Figueroa Street, Suite 3300

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Zaher Lopez

Attorney at REED SMITH LLP

355 S. Grand Avenue, Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance and Designation of Lead Counsel by Brian Patrick Long on behalf of Assurant, Inc. (Long, Brian)Attorney Brian Patrick Long added to party Assurant, Inc.(pty:dft) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Change of Address by Zaher Lopez (Lopez, Zaher) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE AND ORDER: for Early Neutral Evaluation; and (2) Setting Rule 26 Compliance and Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 2/5/2019.(anh) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Assurant, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Assurant, Inc., Other Affiliate TWG Holdings, Inc. for Assurant, Inc. (Lopez, Zaher) (anh). (jao). (Entered: 01/30/2019)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, TWG Holdings, Inc., Improperly named as Assurant, Inc.'s Answer to Complaint by Assurant, Inc..(Lopez, Zaher)Attorney Zaher Lopez added to party Assurant, Inc.(pty:dft) (anh). (Entered: 01/29/2019)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (cdw) (jao). (Entered: 12/19/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Assurant, Inc., Does 1 Through 10 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12019028), filed by Dale Hickman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:18-cv-02851-CAB-AGS. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler are assigned to the case. (Black, Jason)(cdw) (jao). (Entered: 12/19/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance and Designation of Lead Counsel by Brian Patrick Long on behalf of Assurant, Inc. (Long, Brian)Attorney Brian Patrick Long added to party Assurant, Inc.(pty:dft) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Change of Address by Zaher Lopez (Lopez, Zaher) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE AND ORDER: for Early Neutral Evaluation; and (2) Setting Rule 26 Compliance and Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 2/5/2019.(anh) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Assurant, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Assurant, Inc., Other Affiliate TWG Holdings, Inc. for Assurant, Inc. (Lopez, Zaher) (anh). (jao). (Entered: 01/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, TWG Holdings, Inc., Improperly named as Assurant, Inc.'s Answer to Complaint by Assurant, Inc..(Lopez, Zaher)Attorney Zaher Lopez added to party Assurant, Inc.(pty:dft) (anh). (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (cdw) (jao). (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Assurant, Inc., Does 1 Through 10 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12019028), filed by Dale Hickman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:18-cv-02851-CAB-AGS. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler are assigned to the case. (Black, Jason)(cdw) (jao). (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Assurant, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason Nolan Black