This case was last updated from PACER on 11/05/2018 at 07:55:37 (UTC).

Herrington v. Continental American Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 09/06/2018 Herrington filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Continental American Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Irene M. Keeley. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00175

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Virginia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Irene M. Keeley

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

James Herrington

Defendants

Continental American Insurance Company

Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David M. Grunau

Attorney at Grunau Law Offices

244 Pleasant Street

Morgantown, WV 26505

Defendant Attorney

Brad A Funari

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

225 Fifth Avenue

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) DISSMISAL ORDER; It is hereby ORDERED that this civil action is hereby DISMISSED, with prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 10/9/2018. (jmm) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

#7

(#7) Proposed Pretrial Order Dismissal Order by James Herrington. (Grunau, David) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

#6

(#6) ORDER DIRECTING COUNSEL TO SUBMIT DISMISSAL ORDER: The Court DIRECTS counsel to forward an appropriate dismissal order within thirty (30) days following the entry of this Order. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 9/14/2018. (wrr) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Settlement by James Herrington (Grunau, David) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

#4

(#4) STIPULATION for Extension of Time by Continental American Insurance Company. (Funari, Brad) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

3 #4

cover letter

3 #3

Notice Of Removal

3 #2

summons

3 #1

Complaint and Interrogatories

#3

(#3) CERTIFIED STATE COURT RECORD from Circuit Court Of Monongalia County (case number 18-C-314) (Attachments: #1 Complaint and Interrogatories, #2 summons, #3 Notice Of Removal, #4 cover letter) (jmm) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

#2

(#2) FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 10/18/2018. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/1/2018. Scheduling Conference set for 11/15/2018 02:30 PM in Clarksburg District Judge Courtroom, 2nd Floor before Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley. Discovery due by 11/28/2018. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 9/10/2018. (wrr) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C 3 Letters

1 #2

Exhibit B Amended Complaint

1 #1

Exhibit A Copy of State Court Record

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Monongalia County WV, (case number 18-C-314), filed by Continental American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Copy of State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit C 3 Letters, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)Filing Fee PAID $400 - Receipt #0424-2661558. (jmm) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) DISSMISAL ORDER; It is hereby ORDERED that this civil action is hereby DISMISSED, with prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 10/9/2018. (jmm) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Proposed Pretrial Order Dismissal Order by James Herrington. (Grunau, David) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER DIRECTING COUNSEL TO SUBMIT DISMISSAL ORDER: The Court DIRECTS counsel to forward an appropriate dismissal order within thirty (30) days following the entry of this Order. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 9/14/2018. (wrr) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Settlement by James Herrington (Grunau, David) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STIPULATION for Extension of Time by Continental American Insurance Company. (Funari, Brad) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CERTIFIED STATE COURT RECORD from Circuit Court Of Monongalia County (case number 18-C-314) (Attachments: #1 Complaint and Interrogatories, #2 summons, #3 Notice Of Removal, #4 cover letter) (jmm) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 10/18/2018. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/1/2018. Scheduling Conference set for 11/15/2018 02:30 PM in Clarksburg District Judge Courtroom, 2nd Floor before Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley. Discovery due by 11/28/2018. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 9/10/2018. (wrr) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Monongalia County WV, (case number 18-C-314), filed by Continental American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Copy of State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit C 3 Letters, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)Filing Fee PAID $400 - Receipt #0424-2661558. (jmm) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less