This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/29/2018 at 13:01:32 (UTC).

Hernandez v. Warden Legrand et al

Case Summary

On 11/30/2017 Hernandez filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Warden Legrand. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Miranda M. Du and William G. Cobb. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:17-CV-00697

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Miranda M. Du

Referral Judge

William G. Cobb

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Joseph A Hernandez

Respondents

Legrand

Nevada Attorney General

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Rene Valladares

Respondent Attorneys

Adam P. Laxalt

Erin L Bittick

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER appointing FPD S. Alex Spellman as counsel for Petitioner. Amended Petition due within 120 days. Respondents' response due within 60 days thereafter. Petitioner's reply due within 30 days of response. Any exhibits to be filed with separate index. Hard copies of any exhibits to be forwarded, for this case, to the Reno Clerk's Office. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)

#9

(#9) ORDER granting ECF No. 8 Motion to Extend Time : FPD to enter a notice of appearance or otherwise respond to the Court's prior order (ECF No. 3 ) by January 24, 2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)

#3

(#3) ORDER that Petitioner's IFP application ECF No. 1 is denied; filing fee ($5) due 1/3/18; clerk directed to file ECF Nos. 1 - 1 Petition and 1 - 2 Motion for Appointment of Counsel; ECF No. 1 - 2 Motion for Appointment of Coun sel is granted; FPD has until 1/3/18 to make an appearance; clerk directed to add AG as counsel for respondents and e-serve this order (e-served on 12/4/17); Respondents' notice of appearance due 12/25/17; clerk directed to send a copy of this order to FPD and CJA coordinator (e-served on 12/4/17); clerk directed to send copies of all prior filings to AG and FPD (NEF regenerated on 12/4/17); clerk to provide P 2 copies of this order (mailed to P on 12/4/17). Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/4/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)

 

Docket Entries

01/26/2018
View Court Documents

(#11) ORDER appointing FPD S. Alex Spellman as counsel for Petitioner. Amended Petition due within 120 days. Respondents' response due within 60 days thereafter. Petitioner's reply due within 30 days of response. Any exhibits to be filed with separate index. Hard copies of any exhibits to be forwarded, for this case, to the Reno Clerk's Office. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/04/2018
View Court Documents

(#9) ORDER granting ECF No. 8 Motion to Extend Time : FPD to enter a notice of appearance or otherwise respond to the Court's prior order (ECF No. 3 ) by January 24, 2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/04/2017
View Court Documents

(#3) ORDER that Petitioner's IFP application ECF No. 1 is denied; filing fee ($5) due 1/3/18; clerk directed to file ECF Nos. 1 - 1 Petition and 1 - 2 Motion for Appointment of Counsel; ECF No. 1 - 2 Motion for Appointment of Coun sel is granted; FPD has until 1/3/18 to make an appearance; clerk directed to add AG as counsel for respondents and e-serve this order (e-served on 12/4/17); Respondents' notice of appearance due 12/25/17; clerk directed to send a copy of this order to FPD and CJA coordinator (e-served on 12/4/17); clerk directed to send copies of all prior filings to AG and FPD (NEF regenerated on 12/4/17); clerk to provide P 2 copies of this order (mailed to P on 12/4/17). Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/4/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less