This case was last updated from PACER on 12/10/2018 at 10:05:15 (UTC).

Henderson, Titus v. Jess, Cathy et al

Case Summary

On 08/15/2018 Henderson, Titus filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Jess, Cathy. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are James D. Peterson and Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00680

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D. Peterson

Referral Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Titus Henderson

Waupun, WI 53963-0351

Defendants

Warden Peter Huibregtse

T. Overbo

Cathy A. Jess

John/Jane Does

CO II Bartels

Vicki Sebastain

L.R. Iverson

Chaplain Ewing

G. Boughton

Tim Haines

A. Broadbent

Not Classified By Court

WCI Prison Facility

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Corey Francis Finkelmeyer

Attorney at Wisconsin Department of Justice

17 W. Main Street, P.O. Box 7857

Madison, WI 53707-7857

Wisconsin Department of Justice_1983 actions

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Envelope

6 #2

Envelope

#4

(#4) Notice from the Clerk regarding the Prisoner E-Filing Program. (Attachments: #1 Prisoner E-filing Information Packet) (nln),(ps) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

#2

(#2) Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Titus Henderson. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

6 #1

Copy of Letter from EDWI Clerk's Office, Various Pages from Prisoner E-Fil

4 #1

Prisoner E-filing Information Packet

6 #10

(#6) Motion to Waive the Initial Partial Filing Fee by Plaintiff Titus Henderson. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Letter from EDWI Clerk's Office, Various Pages from Prisoner E-Filing Information Packet, #2 Envelope) (nln),(ps) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

#5

(#5) Copy of #3 Order with handwritten note requesting order be mailed to WCI Warden, filed by Plaintiff Titus Henderson. Note: Copy of #3 Order mailed to WCI Business Office on 8/24/2018. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (nln),(ps) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Titus Henderson. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson.) (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (nln) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

#3

(#3) ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff Titus Henderson assessed an initial partial filing fee of $1.14 due 9/17/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 8/24/2018. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

5 #1

Envelope

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Motion to Waive the Initial Partial Filing Fee by Plaintiff Titus Henderson. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Letter from EDWI Clerk's Office, Various Pages from Prisoner E-Filing Information Packet, #2 Envelope) (nln),(ps) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Copy of #3 Order with handwritten note requesting order be mailed to WCI Warden, filed by Plaintiff Titus Henderson. Note: Copy of #3 Order mailed to WCI Business Office on 8/24/2018. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (nln),(ps) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Notice from the Clerk regarding the Prisoner E-Filing Program. (Attachments: #1 Prisoner E-filing Information Packet) (nln),(ps) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff Titus Henderson assessed an initial partial filing fee of $1.14 due 9/17/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 8/24/2018. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Titus Henderson. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Titus Henderson. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson.) (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (nln) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.