This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2019 at 07:58:36 (UTC).

Henderson et al v. Vanliner Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2018 Henderson filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Vanliner Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr and Brian A. Jackson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-01065

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr

Presiding Judge

Brian A. Jackson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Wayne Loney

David Hally

Demarcus Adams

James Henderson

Defendants

Hilldrup Companies, Inc.

Oscar Medrano

Vanliner Insurance Company

United Van Lines, LLC

Mesa Underwriters Specialty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Benjamin Todd Lowe

Attorney at Law Offices of Spencer H. Calahan

827 St. Louis Street

Baton Rouge, LA 70801

Spencer H. Calahan

827 St. Louis Street

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

Defendant Attorneys

Cory Thomas Stuart

Attorney at Larzalere Picou Wells Simpson Lonero, LLC

3850 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 1100, Two Lakeway

Metairie, LA 70002

Guy D. Perrier

Attorney at Perrier & Lacoste

One Canal Place, 365 Canal Street, Suite 2550

New Orleans, LA 70130

Richard Todd Musgrave

Attorney at Musgrave, McLachlan & Penn

1515 Poydras Street, Suite 2380

New Orleans, LA 70112-1812

Amanda Huling Aucoin

Attorney at Musgrave, McLachlan & Penn

1515 Poydras Street, Suite 2380

New Orleans, LA 70112-1812

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: The scheduling conference presently set for January 31, 2019 is CANCELLED. In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. Amended Pleadings due by 5/1/2019. F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1) disclosures due by 2/1/2019. Discovery due by 12/31/2019. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 10/1/2019. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 10/31/2019. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 12/2/2019. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 12/31/2019. Discovery from Experts due by 1/31/2020. Motions shall be filed by 3/31/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/21/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 8/6/2020 at 02:00 PM in chambers before Judge Brian A. Jackson. Motions In Limine shall be filed by 8/18/2020. Affidavit of Settlement Efforts due by 9/8/2020. Joint jury instructions, voir dire, verdict forms, and trial briefs due by 10/2/2020. 10-day Jury Trial set for 10/19/2020-10/30/2020 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Brian A. Jackson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 1/25/2019. (JSL) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to First Supplemental and Amending Petition for Damages with Jury Demand by Mesa Underwriters Specialty Insurance Company.(Musgrave, Richard) Modified on 1/22/2019 to edit the text (SWE). (Entered: 01/22/2019)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Original Petition for Damages by Mesa Underwriters Specialty Insurance Company.(Musgrave, Richard) Modified on 1/22/2019 to edit the text (SWE). (Entered: 01/22/2019)

#5

(#5) Joint STATUS REPORT by All Plaintiffs. (Lowe, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

#4

(#4) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/31/2019 at 04:15 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 1/17/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 12/19/2018. (JSL) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hilldrup Companies, Inc., United Van Lines, LLC, Vanliner Insurance Company (Stuart, Cory) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

#2

(#2) ANSWER to Complaint for Damages and First Supplemental and Amending Petition for Damages with Jury Demand by Oscar Medrano, Vanliner Insurance Company, Hilldrup Companies, Inc.(Stuart, Cory) Modified on 12/18/2018 to edit the text (NLT). (Entered: 12/17/2018)

1 #10

Exhibit G - Hilldrup Docs from SOS

1 #9

Exhibit F - Demands In Globo

1 #12

Exhibit I - Mesa Domicile

1 #11

Exhibit H - Vanliner Docs from SOS

1 #14

Exhibit K - Hally MRI Results

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #16

Exhibit M - Hally Rhizotomy

1 #15

Exhibit L - Hally Branch Blocks

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th JDC East Baton Rouge, Case Number 673263. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1870942), filed by Hilldrup Companies, Inc., Oscar Medrano, Vanliner Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Filing State Court Record, #3 Verification, #4 Exhibit A - Petition for Damages, #5 Exhibit B - Amended Petition, #6 Exhibit C - Hilldrup Service, #7 Exhibit D - State Court Record, #8 Exhibit E - Police Report, #9 Exhibit F - Demands In Globo, #10 Exhibit G - Hilldrup Docs from SOS, #11 Exhibit H - Vanliner Docs from SOS, #12 Exhibit I - Mesa Domicile, #13 Exhibit J - Consent from Mesa, #14 Exhibit K - Hally MRI Results, #15 Exhibit L - Hally Branch Blocks, #16 Exhibit M - Hally Rhizotomy)(Stuart, Cory) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

1 #2

Certificate of Filing State Court Record

1 #7

Exhibit D - State Court Record

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: The scheduling conference presently set for January 31, 2019 is CANCELLED. In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. Amended Pleadings due by 5/1/2019. F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1) disclosures due by 2/1/2019. Discovery due by 12/31/2019. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 10/1/2019. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 10/31/2019. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 12/2/2019. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 12/31/2019. Discovery from Experts due by 1/31/2020. Motions shall be filed by 3/31/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/21/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 8/6/2020 at 02:00 PM in chambers before Judge Brian A. Jackson. Motions In Limine shall be filed by 8/18/2020. Affidavit of Settlement Efforts due by 9/8/2020. Joint jury instructions, voir dire, verdict forms, and trial briefs due by 10/2/2020. 10-day Jury Trial set for 10/19/2020-10/30/2020 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Brian A. Jackson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 1/25/2019. (JSL) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to First Supplemental and Amending Petition for Damages with Jury Demand by Mesa Underwriters Specialty Insurance Company.(Musgrave, Richard) Modified on 1/22/2019 to edit the text (SWE). (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to Original Petition for Damages by Mesa Underwriters Specialty Insurance Company.(Musgrave, Richard) Modified on 1/22/2019 to edit the text (SWE). (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Joint STATUS REPORT by All Plaintiffs. (Lowe, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/31/2019 at 04:15 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 1/17/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 12/19/2018. (JSL) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hilldrup Companies, Inc., United Van Lines, LLC, Vanliner Insurance Company (Stuart, Cory) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ANSWER to Complaint for Damages and First Supplemental and Amending Petition for Damages with Jury Demand by Oscar Medrano, Vanliner Insurance Company, Hilldrup Companies, Inc.(Stuart, Cory) Modified on 12/18/2018 to edit the text (NLT). (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th JDC East Baton Rouge, Case Number 673263. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1870942), filed by Hilldrup Companies, Inc., Oscar Medrano, Vanliner Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Filing State Court Record, #3 Verification, #4 Exhibit A - Petition for Damages, #5 Exhibit B - Amended Petition, #6 Exhibit C - Hilldrup Service, #7 Exhibit D - State Court Record, #8 Exhibit E - Police Report, #9 Exhibit F - Demands In Globo, #10 Exhibit G - Hilldrup Docs from SOS, #11 Exhibit H - Vanliner Docs from SOS, #12 Exhibit I - Mesa Domicile, #13 Exhibit J - Consent from Mesa, #14 Exhibit K - Hally MRI Results, #15 Exhibit L - Hally Branch Blocks, #16 Exhibit M - Hally Rhizotomy)(Stuart, Cory) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.