This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2018 at 06:01:38 (UTC).

Helm v. Director, TDCJ-CID

Case Summary

On 02/01/2018 Helm filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Director, TDCJ-CID. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Barbara M.G. Lynn and Rebecca Rutherford. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00270

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Barbara M.G. Lynn

Referral Judge

Rebecca Rutherford

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Johnathan Lewis Helm

Dayton, TX 77535

Respondent

Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID

 

Court Documents

4 #1

*Restricted*

#1

(#1) 28:2254 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Johnathan Lewis Helm.(bjc, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/2/2018.] (Entered: 07/25/2017)

#6

(#6) Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (zkc) (Entered: 02/02/2018)

#3

(#3) ORDERED that this petition for writ of habeas corpus is transferred to the Dallas Division of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin on 1/26/2018. (bjc) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/2/2018.] (Entered: 01/30/2018)

#4

(#4) Case electronically transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 1:17-cv-00318. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. Modified on 2/2/2018 (zkc). (Entered: 02/02/2018)

#2

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Rutherford (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (zkc) (Entered: 02/02/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (zkc) (Entered: 02/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Rutherford (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (zkc) (Entered: 02/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Case electronically transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 1:17-cv-00318. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. Modified on 2/2/2018 (zkc). (Entered: 02/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDERED that this petition for writ of habeas corpus is transferred to the Dallas Division of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin on 1/26/2018. (bjc) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/2/2018.] (Entered: 01/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement for Johnathan Lewis Helm. (bjc, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/2/2018.] (Entered: 07/25/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin (bjc, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/2/2018.] (Entered: 07/25/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) 28:2254 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Johnathan Lewis Helm.(bjc, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/2/2018.] (Entered: 07/25/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.