This case was last updated from PACER on 08/11/2017 at 02:19:07 (UTC).

Heller v. Regional Environmental Improvement Commission of Iowa County et al

Case Summary

On 08/10/2017 Heller filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against Regional Environmental Improvement Commission of Iowa County. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kelly Mahoney and Linda R Reade. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:17-CV-00093

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Iowa Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kelly Mahoney

Presiding Judge

Linda R Reade

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Richard Heller

Defendants

John Gahring

Iowa County, Iowa

Regional Environmental Improvement Commission of Iowa County

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kellie Lynne Paschke

Attorney at Skinner & Paschke, PLLC

204 W Hickman Rd, **Ecf

Waukee, IA 50263

Defendant Attorney

Jason M Craig

Attorney at Ahlers & Cooney, P.C.

100 Court Ave, Suite 600, ***Ecf

Des Moines, IA 50309

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Regional Environmental Improvement Commission of Iowa County, John Gahring, Iowa County, Iowa. John Gahring served on 7/21/2017, answer due 8/11/2017. (Craig, Jason) (Entered: 08/10/2017)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Regional Environmental Improvement Commission of Iowa County, John Gahring, Iowa County, Iowa. Regional Environmental Improvement Commission of Iowa County served on 7/21/2017, answer due 8/11/2017. (Craig, Jason) (Entered: 08/10/2017)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Regional Environmental Improvement Commission of Iowa County, John Gahring, Iowa County, Iowa. Iowa County, Iowa served on 7/21/2017, answer due 8/11/2017. (Craig, Jason) (Entered: 08/10/2017)

2 #2

Local Rule 81(a) Removal Information

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Removal from Iowa District Court for Iowa County, case number LACV024079. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2528474), filed by Regional Environmental Improvement Commission of Iowa County, John Gahring, Iowa County, Iowa. Scheduling Report due by 10/10/2017 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Local Rule 81(a) Removal Information) (Craig, Jason) (Entered: 08/10/2017)

#1

(#1) NOTICE of New Civil Removal Case Filing by John Gahring, Iowa County, Iowa, Regional Environmental Improvement Commission of Iowa County. (skm) (Entered: 08/10/2017)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Regional Environmental Improvement Commission of Iowa County, John Gahring, Iowa County, Iowa. John Gahring served on 7/21/2017, answer due 8/11/2017. (Craig, Jason) (Entered: 08/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Regional Environmental Improvement Commission of Iowa County, John Gahring, Iowa County, Iowa. Regional Environmental Improvement Commission of Iowa County served on 7/21/2017, answer due 8/11/2017. (Craig, Jason) (Entered: 08/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Regional Environmental Improvement Commission of Iowa County, John Gahring, Iowa County, Iowa. Iowa County, Iowa served on 7/21/2017, answer due 8/11/2017. (Craig, Jason) (Entered: 08/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Removal from Iowa District Court for Iowa County, case number LACV024079. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2528474), filed by Regional Environmental Improvement Commission of Iowa County, John Gahring, Iowa County, Iowa. Scheduling Report due by 10/10/2017 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Local Rule 81(a) Removal Information) (Craig, Jason) (Entered: 08/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE of New Civil Removal Case Filing by John Gahring, Iowa County, Iowa, Regional Environmental Improvement Commission of Iowa County. (skm) (Entered: 08/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • Judge Linda R Reade and Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney added. Conflicts checked; none found. (skm) (Entered: 08/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less