This case was last updated from PACER on 02/05/2019 at 07:51:50 (UTC).

Heiden v. Boffeil et al

Case Summary

On 12/07/2018 Heiden filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Boffeil. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kelly Mahoney and Leonard T Strand. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-03068

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Iowa Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kelly Mahoney

Presiding Judge

Leonard T Strand

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert D Heiden

Fort Dodge, IA 50501

Defendants

Jana Hacker

Jane Doe

Dr David Richter

John Doe

Karen Anderson

Linda Boffeil

Patricia Dettbarn

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) PRO SE DEMAND for Jury Trial re #1 Pro Se Complaint by Jury by Robert D Heiden (NEF mailed to Plt). (skm) Modified on text 12/19/2018 (mmc). (Entered: 12/18/2018)

5 #1

*Restricted*

#5

(#5) Case transferred in from District of Iowa Southern; Case Number 4:18-cv-00455. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. NORTHERN DISTRICT OF IOWA DOCKET BEGINS HERE PSLC notified, NEF mailed to pro se plaintiff. Modified on 12/7/2018 to edit text. (src) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

#4

(#4) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Signed by Chief Judge John A. Jarvey on 12/4/2018. (mem) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 12/7/2018.] (Entered: 12/04/2018)

3 #2

Declaration in Support

3 #1

Memorandum in Support

#3

(#3) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Robert D Heiden. Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 12/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration in Support) (slg) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 12/7/2018.] (Entered: 11/28/2018)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Robert D Heiden. (slg) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 12/7/2018.] (Entered: 11/28/2018)

1 #1

Cover Letter

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Robert D Heiden. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (slg) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 12/7/2018.] (Entered: 11/28/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) PRO SE DEMAND for Jury Trial re #1 Pro Se Complaint by Jury by Robert D Heiden (NEF mailed to Plt). (skm) Modified on text 12/19/2018 (mmc). (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Case transferred in from District of Iowa Southern; Case Number 4:18-cv-00455. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. NORTHERN DISTRICT OF IOWA DOCKET BEGINS HERE PSLC notified, NEF mailed to pro se plaintiff. Modified on 12/7/2018 to edit text. (src) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Signed by Chief Judge John A. Jarvey on 12/4/2018. (mem) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 12/7/2018.] (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Robert D Heiden. Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 12/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration in Support) (slg) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 12/7/2018.] (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Robert D Heiden. (slg) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 12/7/2018.] (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Robert D Heiden. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (slg) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 12/7/2018.] (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.