This case was last updated from PACER on 02/19/2019 at 07:22:55 (UTC).

Heggie v. Diversified Consultants Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/21/2018 Heggie filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Diversified Consultants Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kansas District. The Judges overseeing this case are Julie A. Robinson and James P. O'Hara. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-02707

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kansas District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Julie A. Robinson

Referral Judge

James P. O'Hara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sherry Heggie

Defendants

Diversified Consultants Inc.

Trans Union, LLC

Experian Information Solutions Inc.

Equifax Information Services, LLC

Sprint Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alan J. Stecklein

Attorney at Stecklein & Rapp Chartered

748 Ann Avenue, Suite 101

Kansas City, KS 66101

Matthew Robertson

Attorney at Stecklein & Rapp Chartered

748 Ann Avenue, Suite 101

Kansas City, KS 66101

Michael H. Rapp

Attorney at Stecklein & Rapp Chartered

748 Ann Avenue, Suite 101

Kansas City, KS 66101

Matthew S. Robertson

Attorney at Stecklein & Rapp Chartered

748 Ann Avenue, Suite 101

Kansas City, KS 66101

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew R. Brunkhorst

Attorney at Armstrong Teasdale, LLP - KC

2345 Grand Boulevard, Suite 1500

Kansas City, MO 64108-2617

Paul M. Croker

Attorney at Armstrong Teasdale, LLP - KC

2345 Grand Boulevard, Suite 1500

Kansas City, MO 64108-2617

Bryan E. Mouber

Attorney at Baker, Sterchi, Cowden & Rice, LLC - OP

51 Corporate Woods, 9393 W. 110Th Street, Suite 500

Overland Park, KS 66210

James S. Kreamer

Attorney at Baker, Sterchi, Cowden & Rice, LLC - KC

2400 Pershing Road, Suite 500

Kansas City, MO 64108-2533

Andrea S. McMurtry

Attorney at Horn, Aylward & Bandy LLC

2600 Grand Boulevard, Suite 1100

Kansas City, MO 64108

Danne Wayne Webb

Attorney at Horn, Aylward & Bandy LLC

2600 Grand Boulevard, Suite 1100

Kansas City, MO 64108

Joseph Z. Czerwien

Attorney at Jones Day - Cleveland

901 Lakeside Avenue East

Cleveland, OH 44114-1190

Guillermo Gabriel Zorogastua

Polsinelli Pc - 48Th Street, 900 W. 48Th Place, Suite 900

Kansas City, MO 64112-1895

Phillip James Richard Zeeck

Polsinelli Pc - 48Th Street, 900 W. 48Th Place, Suite 900

Kansas City, MO 64112-1895

 

Court Documents

#29

(#29) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Amended Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Sprint Corporation. (Brunkhorst, Matthew) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

#28

(#28) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Experian Information Solutions Inc.. (McMurtry, Andrea) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

#27

(#27) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Sprint Corporation. (Brunkhorst, Matthew) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

#26

(#26) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Diversified Consultants Inc.. (Brunkhorst, Matthew) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

#25

(#25) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) initial disclosures by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Zorogastua, Guillermo) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

#24

(#24) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's discovery requests to Defendant Diversified Consultants Inc. by Sherry Heggie. (Stecklein, Alan) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

#23

(#23) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's discovery requests to Defendant Experian Information Solutions Inc. by Sherry Heggie. (Stecklein, Alan) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

#22

(#22) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's discovery requests to Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC by Sherry Heggie. (Stecklein, Alan) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

#21

(#21) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's discovery requests to Defendant Sprint Corporation by Sherry Heggie. (Stecklein, Alan) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

#6

(#6) CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 01/11/2019 for Defendant Trans Union, LLC to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 12/26/2018. (ca) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

#5

(#5) DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY by Sherry Heggie. (Stecklein, Alan) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Diversified Consultants Inc. identifying None as corporate parent . (Croker, Paul) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

#3

(#3) DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Diversified Consultants Inc. - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Brunkhorst, Matthew) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Diversified Consultants Inc.. (Brunkhorst, Matthew) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

1 #3

Exhibit C - Separate written notices of consent

1 #2

Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Petition

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Wyandotte County, Kansas, case number 2018-LM-005759 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4667769.), filed by Diversified Consultants Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Petition, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit C - Separate written notices of consent)(Brunkhorst, Matthew) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Amended Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Sprint Corporation. (Brunkhorst, Matthew) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Experian Information Solutions Inc.. (McMurtry, Andrea) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Sprint Corporation. (Brunkhorst, Matthew) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Diversified Consultants Inc.. (Brunkhorst, Matthew) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) initial disclosures by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Zorogastua, Guillermo) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's discovery requests to Defendant Diversified Consultants Inc. by Sherry Heggie. (Stecklein, Alan) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's discovery requests to Defendant Experian Information Solutions Inc. by Sherry Heggie. (Stecklein, Alan) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's discovery requests to Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC by Sherry Heggie. (Stecklein, Alan) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's discovery requests to Defendant Sprint Corporation by Sherry Heggie. (Stecklein, Alan) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's initial Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures by Sherry Heggie. (Stecklein, Alan) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sprint Corporation identifying None as corporate parent . (Croker, Paul) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to Complaint by Sprint Corporation.(Brunkhorst, Matthew) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to Complaint by Diversified Consultants Inc..(Brunkhorst, Matthew) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 01/11/2019 for Defendant Trans Union, LLC to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 12/26/2018. (ca) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY by Sherry Heggie. (Stecklein, Alan) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Diversified Consultants Inc. identifying None as corporate parent . (Croker, Paul) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Diversified Consultants Inc. - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Brunkhorst, Matthew) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Diversified Consultants Inc.. (Brunkhorst, Matthew) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Wyandotte County, Kansas, case number 2018-LM-005759 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4667769.), filed by Diversified Consultants Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Petition, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit C - Separate written notices of consent)(Brunkhorst, Matthew) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less