Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 02/17/2019 at 07:47:24 (UTC).

HEDGE v. TOYOTA MOTOR MANUFACTURING, INDIANA, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 12/19/2018 HEDGE filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against TOYOTA MOTOR MANUFACTURING, INDIANA, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard L. Young and Matthew P. Brookman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00246

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard L. Young

Referral Judge

Matthew P. Brookman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DENIA HEDGE

DUSTIN TURLEY

MELISSA MCCLARY

Defendants

TOYOTA MOTOR MANUFACTURING, INDIANA, INC.

AEROTEK, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert J. Hunt

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF ROBERT J. HUNT, LLC

1905 South New Market Street, Suite 220

Carmel, IN 46032

Defendant Attorneys

Anna M. Skaggs

Attorney at PAUL HASTINGS LLP

101 California Street, 48Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Zina Deldar

Attorney at PAUL HASTINGS LLP

101 California Street, 48Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Zachary P. Hutton

Attorney at PAUL HASTINGS LLP

101 California Street, 48Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

John W. Borkowski

Attorney at HUSCH BLACKWELL LLP

120 S. Riverside Plaza, 22Nd Floor

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

29 #1

Exhibit 13 - Consent of William Reed Hamm

#29

(#29) NOTICE of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaint Form (Tenth) by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 13 - Consent of William Reed Hamm) (Hunt, Robert) (Entered: 02/16/2019)

28 #1

Exhibit A - Orientation Guide

#28

(#28) AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiffs' First Amended Class Action and FLSA Collective Action Complaint for Damages against All Defendants, filed by DENIA HEDGE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Orientation Guide)(Hunt, Robert) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

27 #1

Exhibit 12 - Consent of Linda Moore

#27

(#27) NOTICE of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaint Form (Ninth) by DENIA HEDGE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 12 - Consent of Linda Moore) (Hunt, Robert) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

26 #1

Exhibit 11 - Consent of Mike Gallamore

#26

(#26) NOTICE of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaint Form (Eighth) by DENIA HEDGE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 11 - Consent of Mike Gallamore) (Hunt, Robert) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

25 #2

Exhibit 10 - Consent of Shalynn Miller

5 #1

Exhibit 1 - Consent of Denia Hedge

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaint Form (First) by DENIA HEDGE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Consent of Denia Hedge) (Hunt, Robert) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

#4

(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to AEROTEK, INC., TOYOTA MOTOR MANUFACTURING, INDIANA, INC. (JRB) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Hunt on behalf of Plaintiff DENIA HEDGE. (Hunt, Robert) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

1 #3

Text of Proposed Order

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A - Orientation Guide

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by DENIA HEDGE. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5205092) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Orientation Guide, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Hunt, Robert) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) NOTICE of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaint Form (Tenth) by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 13 - Consent of William Reed Hamm) (Hunt, Robert) (Entered: 02/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiffs' First Amended Class Action and FLSA Collective Action Complaint for Damages against All Defendants, filed by DENIA HEDGE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Orientation Guide)(Hunt, Robert) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) NOTICE of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaint Form (Ninth) by DENIA HEDGE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 12 - Consent of Linda Moore) (Hunt, Robert) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) NOTICE of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaint Form (Eighth) by DENIA HEDGE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 11 - Consent of Mike Gallamore) (Hunt, Robert) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) NOTICE of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaint Forms (Seventh) by DENIA HEDGE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 9 - Consent of David Conner, #2 Exhibit 10 - Consent of Shalynn Miller) (Hunt, Robert) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - Initial Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 3/14/2019 at 09:30 AM (Central Time) before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 1/23/2019.(JRB) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) Corporate Disclosure Statement by TOYOTA MOTOR MANUFACTURING, INDIANA, INC. identifying Other Affiliate TOYOTA MOTOR CORPORATION, Other Affiliate TOYOTA MOTOR NORTH AMERICA, INC., Other Affiliate TOYOTA MOTOR ENGINEERING & MANUFACTURING NORTH AMERICA, INC. for TOYOTA MOTOR MANUFACTURING, INDIANA, INC... (Hutton, Zachary) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant AEROTEK, INC.. (Borkowski, John) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Corporate Disclosure Statement by AEROTEK, INC.. (Borkowski, John) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) NOTICE of Appearance by John W. Borkowski on behalf of Defendant AEROTEK, INC.. (Borkowski, John) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiff Form (Sixth), filed by Plaintiff DENIA HEDGE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 8 - Consent of Melissa McClary) (Hunt, Robert) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaint Form (Fifth) by DENIA HEDGE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7 - Consent of Lindsay Granderson) (Hunt, Robert) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiff Form (Fourth) by DENIA HEDGE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6 - Consent of James Carlton) (Hunt, Robert) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaint Form (Third) by DENIA HEDGE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5 - Consent of Seth Hawkins) (Hunt, Robert) (Entered: 12/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiff Forms (Second) by DENIA HEDGE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 - Consent of Johnny Johann, #2 Exhibit 3 -Consent of Dustin Turley, #3 Exhibit 4 - Consent of Daryl McCullough) (Hunt, Robert) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaint Form (First) by DENIA HEDGE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Consent of Denia Hedge) (Hunt, Robert) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to AEROTEK, INC., TOYOTA MOTOR MANUFACTURING, INDIANA, INC. (JRB) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Hunt on behalf of Plaintiff DENIA HEDGE. (Hunt, Robert) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by DENIA HEDGE. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5205092) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Orientation Guide, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Hunt, Robert) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AEROTEK INC. A MARYLAND CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Toyota Motor Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Zachary P Hutton(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John W Borkowski