This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2018 at 07:03:29 (UTC).

Heather Turner Photography, LLC v. Aljo Designs, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/05/2018 Heather Turner Photography, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Aljo Designs, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Rebecca Beach Smith and Douglas E. Miller. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00005

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rebecca Beach Smith

Referral Judge

Douglas E. Miller

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Heather Turner Photography, LLC

Defendant

Aljo Designs, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Julia Amato Rust

Attorney at Pierce McCoy, PLLC

101 W. Main Street, Suite 101

Norfolk, VA 23510

Defendant Attorneys

John Elphinstone McIntosh, Jr.

Attorney at Hudgins Law Firm PC

515 King Street, Suite 400

Alexandria, VA 22314

James Arthur Cales, III

Attorney at Furniss Davis Rashkind & Saunders PC

6160 Kempsville Circle, Suite 341B, Po Box 12525

Norfolk, VA 23541-0525

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) RULE 26(f) PRETRIAL ORDER: Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference set for 3/13/2018 at 09:30 AM in Norfolk. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on February 23, 2018. (sche) (Entered: 02/23/2018)

#12

(#12) AGREED ORDER granting #7 Consent MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on 2/21/2018. (clou) (Entered: 02/21/2018)

#11

(#11) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Aljo Designs, LLC. (McIntosh, John) (Entered: 02/20/2018)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Aljo Designs, LLC.(McIntosh, John) (Entered: 02/16/2018)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by John Elphinstone McIntosh, Jr on behalf of Aljo Designs, LLC (McIntosh, John) (Entered: 02/16/2018)

#8

(#8) Brief in Support to #7 Consent MOTION to Substitute Attorney filed by Aljo Designs, LLC. (Cales, James) (Entered: 02/16/2018)

7 #1

Proposed Order Agreed Proposed Order

#7

(#7) Consent MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Aljo Designs, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Agreed Proposed Order)(Cales, James) (Entered: 02/16/2018)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deft is DIRECTED to file a response to #1 Complaint by 2/19/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on 2/5/18. (bpet) (Entered: 02/05/2018)

5 #1

Proposed Order

#5

(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or other Rule 12 Response, by agreement by Aljo Designs, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cales, James) (Entered: 02/02/2018)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Heather Turner Photography, LLC. Aljo Designs, LLC served on 1/15/2018. (clou) (Entered: 01/25/2018)

1 #5

Letter

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Aljo Designs, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-5884606.), filed by Heather Turner Photography, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Letter)(epri) (Entered: 01/09/2018)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) RULE 26(f) PRETRIAL ORDER: Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference set for 3/13/2018 at 09:30 AM in Norfolk. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on February 23, 2018. (sche) (Entered: 02/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) AGREED ORDER granting #7 Consent MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on 2/21/2018. (clou) (Entered: 02/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • Refer for 16(b) (clou) (Entered: 02/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Douglas E. Miller. #7 Consent MOTION to Substitute Attorney. (clou ) (Entered: 02/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Aljo Designs, LLC. (McIntosh, John) (Entered: 02/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Aljo Designs, LLC.(McIntosh, John) (Entered: 02/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by John Elphinstone McIntosh, Jr on behalf of Aljo Designs, LLC (McIntosh, John) (Entered: 02/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Brief in Support to #7 Consent MOTION to Substitute Attorney filed by Aljo Designs, LLC. (Cales, James) (Entered: 02/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Consent MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Aljo Designs, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Agreed Proposed Order)(Cales, James) (Entered: 02/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deft is DIRECTED to file a response to #1 Complaint by 2/19/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on 2/5/18. (bpet) (Entered: 02/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or other Rule 12 Response, by agreement. (bpet) (Entered: 02/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or other Rule 12 Response, by agreement by Aljo Designs, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cales, James) (Entered: 02/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Heather Turner Photography, LLC. Aljo Designs, LLC served on 1/15/2018. (clou) (Entered: 01/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Aljo Designs, LLC. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri) (Entered: 01/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Heather Turner Photography, LLC. (epri) (Entered: 01/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Aljo Designs, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-5884606.), filed by Heather Turner Photography, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Letter)(epri) (Entered: 01/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.