This case was last updated from PACER on 12/11/2018 at 07:39:08 (UTC).

Heath et al v. Diaz & Associates, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/12/2018 Heath filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Diaz Associates, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John A. Gibney, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00704

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John A. Gibney, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Scott Rogers

Sean Lawrence

Marsha Heath

Robert Kemery

Defendant

Diaz & Associates, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kristi Cahoon Kelly

Attorney at Kelly & Crandall PLC

3925 Chain Bridge Road, Suite 202

Fairfax, VA 22030

Casey Shannon Nash

Attorney at Kelly & Crandall PLC

3925 Chain Bridge Road, Suite 202

Fairfax, VA 22030

Andrew Joseph Guzzo

Attorney at Kelly & Crandall PLC

3925 Chain Bridge Road, Suite 202

Fairfax, VA 22030

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Diaz & Associates, Inc.. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for the Defendant. Serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon the Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the additional copy of the summons (executed or unexecuted) on paper to the Clerk's Office. (walk, ) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

3 #1

Affidavit

3 #2

Letter

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed for Diaz & Associates, Inc. served on 10/17/2018, answer due 11/7/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Letter)(ccol, ) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

#1

(#1) CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed by Marsha Heath, Scott Rogers, Sean Lawrence and Robert Kemery against Diaz & Associates, Inc. (Filing Fee Paid: $400.00, Receipt Number: 0422-6313974). (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (walk, ) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed for Diaz & Associates, Inc. served on 10/17/2018, answer due 11/7/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Letter)(ccol, ) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Diaz & Associates, Inc.. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for the Defendant. Serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon the Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the additional copy of the summons (executed or unexecuted) on paper to the Clerk's Office. (walk, ) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed by Marsha Heath, Scott Rogers, Sean Lawrence and Robert Kemery against Diaz & Associates, Inc. (Filing Fee Paid: $400.00, Receipt Number: 0422-6313974). (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (walk, ) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.