This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2020 at 12:52:20 (UTC).

Hearod v. CVS Health

Case Summary

On 07/13/2018 Hearod filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against CVS Health. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kimberly E. West and Ronald A. White. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:18-CV-00220

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Kimberly E. West

Ronald A. White

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Hearod

Defendants

CVS Health

CVS Health its subsidiaries and affiliated corporations, including Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC, an Oklahoma limited liability company formerly known as CVS Caremark Corporation doing business as CVS Pharmacy Store #10275 - Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC

CVS Caremark Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Warren Gotcher

Attorney at Gotcher and Beaver

Po Box 160

Mcalester, OK 74502

Defendant Attorneys

G. Calvin Sharpe

Attorney at Phillips Murrah, PC

101 N Robinson, Suite 1300

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Amy D. White

Attorney at Phillips Murrah, PC

101 N Robinson, Suite 1300

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) JOINT STATUS REPORT by CVS Health (White, Amy) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

#11

(#11) DISCLOSURES per FRCP 26 by CVS Health (White, Amy) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

#10

(#10) DISCLOSURES per FRCP 26 by Michael Hearod (Gotcher, Warren) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

#9

(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent CVS Pharmacy, Inc. for CVS Health) by CVS Health (Sharpe, G.) (Entered: 07/25/2018)

#8

(#8) ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White directing parties to file their Disclosures and Joint Status Report no later than 8/20/2018 (tls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

#6

(#6) ANSWER with Jury Demand to Petition/Complaint filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by CVS Health (Sharpe, G.) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by G. Calvin Sharpe on behalf of CVS Health (Sharpe, G.) (Entered: 07/13/2018)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Amy D. White on behalf of CVS Health (White, Amy) (Entered: 07/13/2018)

#3

(#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk. Defendant is directed to pay the $400 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. Consent forms provided to filing party (Filing Fee due by 7/20/2018) (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/13/2018)

2 #3

Exhibit 3 - Docket Sheet

2 #2

Exhibit 2 - Summons

2 #1

Exhibit 1 - Petition

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Removal from Pittsburg County District Court, case number 18-CJ-139 by CVS Health (With attachments) (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/13/2018)

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by CVS Health (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/13/2018)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2018
  • Docket(#13) MINUTE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White setting Scheduling Conference for 9/19/18 at 10:30 a.m. in Chambers, Room 227, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Judge Ronald A. White (dma, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) JOINT STATUS REPORT by CVS Health (White, Amy) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) DISCLOSURES per FRCP 26 by CVS Health (White, Amy) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) DISCLOSURES per FRCP 26 by Michael Hearod (Gotcher, Warren) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent CVS Pharmacy, Inc. for CVS Health) by CVS Health (Sharpe, G.) (Entered: 07/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White directing parties to file their Disclosures and Joint Status Report no later than 8/20/2018 (tls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • (#7) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk - Pursuant to receipt of an election of the District Judge Option and in accordance with LCvR 40.1(c), this case is reassigned to Judge Ronald A. White. Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West no longer assigned to case. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV 18-220-RAW. (adw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER with Jury Demand to Petition/Complaint filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by CVS Health (Sharpe, G.) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • FILING FEES Paid in Full on 7/13/2018 in the amount of $400, receipt number 1086-1191598 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by CVS Health (Sharpe, G.) (Entered: 07/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by G. Calvin Sharpe on behalf of CVS Health (Sharpe, G.) (Entered: 07/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Amy D. White on behalf of CVS Health (White, Amy) (Entered: 07/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk. Defendant is directed to pay the $400 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. Consent forms provided to filing party (Filing Fee due by 7/20/2018) (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Removal from Pittsburg County District Court, case number 18-CJ-139 by CVS Health (With attachments) (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by CVS Health (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • PETITION filed in State Court against CVS Health by Michael Hearod (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less