This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2018 at 08:02:47 (UTC).

(HC) Mudung v. ICE

Case Summary

On 08/23/2018 HC Mudung filed an Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee lawsuit against ICE. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Stanley A. Boone. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01140

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stanley A. Boone

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Penapu Nena Mudung

Bakersfield, CA 93301

Respondent

ICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Audrey Benison Hemesath

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office

501 I Street, Suite 10-100

Sacramento, CA 95814

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) ORDER AUTHORIZING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS as to Penapu Nena Mudung signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 08/27/2018. (Flores, E) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#1

(#1) (2241) PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against ICE by Penapu Nena Mudung.(Flores, E) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#4

(#4) ORDER DIRECTING RESPONDENT to File a Response to Petition signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/28/2018. Clerk to serve a copy of this order, a copy of the Petition and the Order re Consent on the Office of the United States Attorney for the Eastern District of California and an agent for the appropriate Correctional Institution, if applicable. (Jessen, A) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

#3

(#3) PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 10/1/2018. (Flores, E) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to DISMISS by ICE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hemesath, Audrey) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) PROOF of SERVICE by Penapu Nena Mudung as to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (Hellings, J) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order Directing Respondent to File a Response to the Petition served on Penapu Nena Mudung. (Jessen, A) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DOCUMENTS SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus served on Office of the United States Attorney for the Eastern District of California. (Jessen, A) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER DIRECTING RESPONDENT to File a Response to Petition signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/28/2018. Clerk to serve a copy of this order, a copy of the Petition and the Order re Consent on the Office of the United States Attorney for the Eastern District of California and an agent for the appropriate Correctional Institution, if applicable. (Jessen, A) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE BY MAIL: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, #2 Order Authorizing IFP Status served on Penapu Nena Mudung. (Flores, E) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 10/1/2018. (Flores, E) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER AUTHORIZING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS as to Penapu Nena Mudung signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 08/27/2018. (Flores, E) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) (2241) PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against ICE by Penapu Nena Mudung.(Flores, E) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less