This case was last updated from PACER on 01/21/2021 at 11:22:38 (UTC).

(HC) Lollis v. Sutton et al

Case Summary

On 06/20/2018 HC Lollis filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Sutton. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sheila K. Oberto and Dale A. Drozd. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00843

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Sheila K. Oberto

Presiding Judge

Dale A. Drozd

 

Party Details

Petitioner

William Matthew Lollis

Corcoran, CA 93212-3456

Respondents

Jhon Sutton

Scott Kernon

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

Charity Seraph Whitney

Attorney at California Attorney General

2550 Mariposa Mall, Room 5090

Fresno, CA 93721

Tami M. Krenzin

Attorney at Attorney General's Office for the State of California

P.O. Box 944255, 1300 I Street, Suite 125

Sacramento, CA 94244-2550

 

Court Documents

#33

(#33) ORDER granting Petitioner's Request for voluntary dismissal #7 , #29 , #30 signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/28/2019. CASE CLOSED. (Lundstrom, T) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

#31

(#31) ORDER Requiring Respondent to Respond to Petitioner's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 03/13/2019. (Flores, E) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

#29

(#29) FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Doc. #1 ) be DISMISSED With Prejudice, the Court Decline to Issue a Certificate of Appealability, and Decline to Hold an Evidentiary Hearing re #7 signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/23/2019. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

#23

No Description Available

#17

No Description Available

#27

SERVICE BY MAIL: #27 Order on Motion for Extension of Time served on William Matthew Lollis. (Lundstrom, T) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

#26

No Description Available

25 #34

Exhibit Lodged Doc #34

25 #20

Exhibit Lodged Doc #20

25 #14

Exhibit Lodged Doc #14

25 #13

Exhibit Lodged Doc #13

25 #9

Exhibit Lodged Doc #9

25 #7

Exhibit Lodged Doc #7

25 #1

Exhibit Lodged Doc #1

#20

No Description Available

#14

No Description Available

#11

No Description Available

#7

(#29) FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Doc. #1 ) be DISMISSED With Prejudice, the Court Decline to Issue a Certificate of Appealability, and Decline to Hold an Evidentiary Hearing re #7 signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/23/2019. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

59 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE BY MAIL: #33 Order served on William Matthew Lollis. (Lundstrom, T) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) ORDER granting Petitioner's Request for voluntary dismissal #7 , #29 , #30 signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/28/2019. CASE CLOSED. (Lundstrom, T) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) NOTICE of Decline to Stipulate to Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Jhon Sutton. Attorney Krenzin, Tami M. added. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Krenzin, Tami) (Entered: 03/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE BY MAIL: #31 Order served on William Matthew Lollis. (Flores, E) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) ORDER Requiring Respondent to Respond to Petitioner's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 03/13/2019. (Flores, E) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by William Matthew Lollis. (Flores, E) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE BY MAIL: #29 Findings and Recommendations served on William Matthew Lollis. (Jessen, A) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Doc. #1 ) be DISMISSED With Prejudice, the Court Decline to Issue a Certificate of Appealability, and Decline to Hold an Evidentiary Hearing re #7 signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/23/2019. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) TRAVERSE by William Matthew Lollis. (Sant Agata, S) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE BY MAIL: #27 Order on Motion for Extension of Time served on William Matthew Lollis. (Lundstrom, T) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 07/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by William Matthew Lollis. (Jessen, A) (Entered: 07/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Witness Testimony by William Matthew Lollis. (Jessen, A) (Entered: 07/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus served on Tami Krenzin. (Martin-Gill, S) (Entered: 06/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT for Respondent, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 06/28/18. Consent or Decline due by 8/2/2018 (Martin-Gill, S) (Entered: 06/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order Directing Respondent to File a Response to the Petition, served on William Matthew Lollis. (Martin-Gill, S) (Entered: 06/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER DIRECTING RESPONDENT to File a Response to Petition, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 06/27/18. Clerk to serve a copy of this order, a copy of the Petition and the Order re Consent on the Attorney General. Consent or Decline due by 8/30/2018 (Martin-Gill, S) (Entered: 06/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE BY MAIL: #1 Petition only, #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, #2 Order Authorizing IFP Status served on William Matthew Lollis. (Martin-Gill, S) (Entered: 06/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 7/26/2018 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Martin-Gill, S) (Entered: 06/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER AUTHORIZING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS as to William M. Lollis, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 06/22/18. (Martin-Gill, S) (Entered: 06/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Scott Kernon, Jhon Sutton by William Matthew Lollis.(Martin-Gill, S) (Entered: 06/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less