This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/29/2018 at 13:51:44 (UTC).

Douglas v. Arnold

Case Summary

On 08/01/2017 Douglas filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Arnold. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kendall J. Newman. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:17-CV-01592

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kendall J. Newman

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Tyrone Arthur Douglas

Respondent

Eric Arnold

Amicus Curiae

American Civil Liberties Union Foundation

National Association of the Deaf

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Amicus Curiae Attorney

Claudia B Center

 

Court Documents

#14

#25

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/9/2017 DENYING without prejudice petitioner's 12 request for appointment of counsel and RECOMMENDING respondent's 17 motion to dismiss be granted, and this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/28/2017 GRANTING 13 Request to file Amicus Brief. The Clerk shall docket and file the Amicus Brief. (Donati, J)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF THE DEAF is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION is a litigant