This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2020 at 17:01:25 (UTC).

Hayslett et al v. The Abbott Laboratories et al

Case Summary

On 11/13/2018 Hayslett filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against The Abbott Laboratories. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Frederick P. Stamp, Jr and John Preston Bailey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-00186

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    West Virginia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Frederick P. Stamp, Jr

John Preston Bailey

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Chad Hayslett

Jan Hayslett

Defendants

Kremers-Urban Co.

Lannett Co., Inc.

Mallinckrodt Inc.

McNeilab, Inc.

Rhone-Poulenc Rorer Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

The Abbott Laboratories

Rowell Laboratories, Inc.

GlaxoSmithKline LLC

Carnrick Laboratories, Inc.

Dart Industries Inc.

Merck & Co., Inc.

The Upjohn Company

Eli Lilly and Company

E.R. Squibb & Sons, Inc.

Burroughs-Welcome & Co., Inc.

Merrell Dow Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

SmithKline Beecham Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael A. London

Attorney at Douglas & London, P.C.

59 Maiden Lane, 6Th Floor

New York, NY 10038

Virginia E. Anello

Attorney at Douglas & London, P.C.

59 Maiden Lane, 6Th Floor

New York, NY 10038

Harry G. Deitzler

Attorney at Hill, Peterson, Carper, Bee & Deitzler, PLLC

500 Tracy Way

Charleston, WV 25322-1261

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac for Attorney London. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 12/17/18. (lmm) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

(#7) ORDER TRANSFERRING CIVIL ACTION: Case reassigned to District Judge John Preston Bailey for all further proceedings. Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr no longer assigned to case. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 11/27/18. (soa) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

6 #4

Attachment Proposed Order

6 #2

Exhibit B- D & L law firm WV cases

6 #1

Exhibit A- List of WV cases for Michael London

5 #4

Attachment Proposed Order

5 #3

Attachment WV State Bar Receipt

5 #2

Exhibit B- D & L law firm WV cases

5 #1

Exhibit A- Virginia Anello's WV cases

#5

(#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Virginia Anello by Chad Hayslett, Jan Hayslett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Virginia Anello's WV cases, #2 Exhibit B- D & L law firm WV cases, #3 Attachment WV State Bar Receipt, #4 Attachment Proposed Order)(Deitzler, Harry) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

#4

(#4) VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION as to Attorney Anello. (lmm) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

#3

(#3) VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION as to Attorney London. (lmm) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jan Hayslett, Chad Hayslett. Filing Fee PAID $400 on 11/09/2018 - Receipt #0424-2703150. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(lmm) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac for Attorney Anello. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 12/17/18. (lmm) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac for Attorney London. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 12/17/18. (lmm) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Pro Hac Vice Filing fee for Virginia Anello and Michael London: $ 400.00, receipt number WVNC002422 (nmm) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER TRANSFERRING CIVIL ACTION: Case reassigned to District Judge John Preston Bailey for all further proceedings. Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr no longer assigned to case. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 11/27/18. (soa) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael London by Chad Hayslett, Jan Hayslett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- List of WV cases for Michael London, #2 Exhibit B- D & L law firm WV cases, #3 Attachment WV State Bar Receipt, #4 Attachment Proposed Order)(Deitzler, Harry) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Virginia Anello by Chad Hayslett, Jan Hayslett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Virginia Anello's WV cases, #2 Exhibit B- D & L law firm WV cases, #3 Attachment WV State Bar Receipt, #4 Attachment Proposed Order)(Deitzler, Harry) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION as to Attorney Anello. (lmm) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION as to Attorney London. (lmm) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jan Hayslett, Chad Hayslett. Filing Fee PAID $400 on 11/09/2018 - Receipt #0424-2703150. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(lmm) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Rowell Laboratories, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Merrell Dow Pharmaceuticals, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where McNeilab, Inc is a litigant