This case was last updated from PACER on 02/21/2018 at 05:52:30 (UTC).

Hayes v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al

Case Summary

On 02/20/2018 Hayes filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Karen K. Caldwell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-00145

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karen K. Caldwell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alphonso Hayes

Defendants

Bristol-Myers Squibb Company

AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP

McKesson Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Randi Alyson Kassan

Attorney at Sanders Phillips Grossman, LLC

100 Garden City Plaza, Suite 500

Garden City, NY 11530

Douglas H. Sanders

100 Garden City Plaza, Suite 500

Garden City, NY 11530

Defendant Attorney

Robert K. Woo, Jr.

Attorney at King & Spalding - Atlanta

1180 Peachtree Street N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30309-3521

 

Court Documents

18 #1

*Restricted*

#18

(#18) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Georgia Northern. Case number 3:17-cv-00157. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received electronically. cc COR w/ copy of docket sheet to non-registered filers (Entered: 02/20/2018)

#17

(#17) Certified copy of [CTO-1] ORDER from the MDL Panel TRANSFERRING action to the Eastern District of Kentucky for inclusion in MDL 2809. (rsh) [Transferred from gand on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 02/20/2018)

#16

(#16) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Alphonso Hayes Discovery Disclosure, Initial Disclosures (Sanders, Douglas) [Transferred from gand on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 12/28/2017)

15 #3

Exhibit C - Proposed Order regarding Procedures for Electronically Stored Inform

15 #2

Exhibit B - Proposed Stipulation and Order Regarding Claims of Privilege and Pri

15 #1

Exhibit A - Proposed Stipulated Protective Order

#15

(#15) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Stipulated Protective Order, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Stipulation and Order Regarding Claims of Privilege and Privilege Logs, #3 Exhibit C - Proposed Order regarding Procedures for Electronically Stored Information)(Woo, Robert) [Transferred from gand on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 12/27/2017)

#14

(#14) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Initial Disclosures by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation.(Woo, Robert) [Transferred from gand on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 12/27/2017)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company.(Woo, Robert) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. [Transferred from gand on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 11/27/2017)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP identifying Corporate Parent AstraZeneca plc, Other Affiliate AstraZeneca AB, Other Affiliate Zeneca, Inc. for AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP.(Woo, Robert) [Transferred from gand on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 11/27/2017)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. Discovery ends on 4/26/2018.(Woo, Robert) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. [Transferred from gand on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 11/27/2017)

#3

(#3) Return of Service Executed by Alphonso Hayes. AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP served on 11/6/2017, answer due 11/27/2017. (Sanders, Douglas) [Transferred from gand on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 11/09/2017)

2 #2

Summons AstraZeneca

2 #1

Summons Bristol-Myers

#2

(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Main Document: Summons McKesson) (Attachments: #1 Summons Bristol-Myers, #2 Summons AstraZeneca)(jlm) [Transferred from gand on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 10/31/2017)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#8) ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by McKesson Corporation.(Woo, Robert) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. [Transferred from gand on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 11/27/2017)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2018
  • REMARK: Counsel shall refer to #www.kyed.uscourts.gov/518-md-02809-kkc for review of Orders relative to filing procedures in MDL 2809. If you are not registered as an ECF Filing User, please complete the ECF Registration Form and return it to the Clerk within twenty-one (21) days. cc: Order Regarding Practice & Procedure upon Transfer filed February 9, 2018 served via U.S. Mail to counsel not registered as ECF Filing Users. (CBD) (Entered: 02/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • Conflict Check run. (CBD) (Entered: 02/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Georgia Northern. Case number 3:17-cv-00157. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received electronically. cc COR w/ copy of docket sheet to non-registered filers (Entered: 02/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • Case electronically transferred to District of Eastern District of Kentucky for inclusion in MDL 2809. (rsh) [Transferred from gand on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 02/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Certified copy of [CTO-1] ORDER from the MDL Panel TRANSFERRING action to the Eastern District of Kentucky for inclusion in MDL 2809. (rsh) [Transferred from gand on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 02/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Alphonso Hayes Discovery Disclosure, Initial Disclosures (Sanders, Douglas) [Transferred from gand on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 12/28/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Stipulated Protective Order, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Stipulation and Order Regarding Claims of Privilege and Privilege Logs, #3 Exhibit C - Proposed Order regarding Procedures for Electronically Stored Information)(Woo, Robert) [Transferred from gand on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 12/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Initial Disclosures by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation.(Woo, Robert) [Transferred from gand on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 12/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation. (Woo, Robert) [Transferred from gand on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 12/11/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Instructions to Parties and Counsel. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr on 11/28/17. (rsh) [Transferred from gand on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 11/28/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Return of Service Executed by Alphonso Hayes. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company served on 11/15/2017, answer due 12/6/2017. (Kassan, Randi) [Transferred from gand on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 11/28/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by McKesson Corporation by McKesson Corporation.(Woo, Robert) [Transferred from gand on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 11/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by McKesson Corporation.(Woo, Robert) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. [Transferred from gand on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 11/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company.(Woo, Robert) [Transferred from gand on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 11/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company.(Woo, Robert) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. [Transferred from gand on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 11/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP identifying Corporate Parent AstraZeneca plc, Other Affiliate AstraZeneca AB, Other Affiliate Zeneca, Inc. for AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP.(Woo, Robert) [Transferred from gand on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 11/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. Discovery ends on 4/26/2018.(Woo, Robert) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. [Transferred from gand on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 11/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Return of Service Executed by Alphonso Hayes. AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP served on 11/6/2017, answer due 11/27/2017. (Sanders, Douglas) [Transferred from gand on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 11/09/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Main Document: Summons McKesson) (Attachments: #1 Summons Bristol-Myers, #2 Summons AstraZeneca)(jlm) [Transferred from gand on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 10/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113E-7479086.), filed by Alphonso Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jlm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. [Transferred from gand on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 10/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less