This case was last updated from PACER on 06/15/2017 at 02:21:48 (UTC).

Hawaii Insulators Supplemental Pension Trust v. A's Insulation, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/14/2017 Hawaii Insulators Supplemental Pension Trust filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against A's Insulation, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Hawaii District. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD L. PUGLISI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:17-CV-00285

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hawaii District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RICHARD L. PUGLISI

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Hawaii Insulators Pension Trust

Hawaii Insulators Supplemental Pension Trust

Hawaii Insulators Vacation & Holiday Trust

Hawaii Insulators Training Trust

Hawaii Insulators Supplemental Unemployment Benefits Trust

Hawaii Insulators Health and Welfare Trust

Defendants

A's Insulation, Inc.

Eva Acidera

Doe Trusts 1-10

Doe Governmental Agencies 1-10

Jane Does 1-10

John Does 1-10

Armando Acidera

Doe Corporations 1-10

Doe Partnerships 1-10

Craig Acidera

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christin D. W. Kawada

Attorney at Yee & Kawashima, LLLP

1000 Bishop Street, Ste 908

Honolulu, HI 96813

Jared N. Kawashima

Attorney at Yee & Kawashima, LLLP

1000 Bishop Street, Suite 908

Honolulu, HI 96813

 

Court Documents

6 #1

Election Form: Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Attachments: #1 Election Form: Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge) (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry. ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (Entered: 06/14/2017)

5 #2

AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons

5 #1

AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons

#5

(#5) CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, ) (Entered: 06/14/2017)

4 #1

Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements

#4

(#4) Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00AM on 8/9/2017 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 6/14/2017. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry. ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (Entered: 06/14/2017)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to A's Insulation, Inc., Armando Acidera, Craig Acidera, Eva Acidera. (emt, ) (Entered: 06/14/2017)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Summons

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ; Summons against A's Insulation, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-1885928.), filed by Hawaii Insulators Supplemental Pension Trust. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kawada, Christin) (Entered: 06/14/2017)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Attachments: #1 Election Form: Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge) (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry. ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (Entered: 06/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, ) (Entered: 06/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00AM on 8/9/2017 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 6/14/2017. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry. ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (Entered: 06/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to A's Insulation, Inc., Armando Acidera, Craig Acidera, Eva Acidera. (emt, ) (Entered: 06/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - 2 Notice of Case Assignment has been served on June 14, 2017. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, ) (Entered: 06/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • (#2) NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 17-00285 RLP on all further pleadings. (emt, ) (Entered: 06/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ; Summons against A's Insulation, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-1885928.), filed by Hawaii Insulators Supplemental Pension Trust. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kawada, Christin) (Entered: 06/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less