This case was last updated from PACER on 09/17/2018 at 08:08:40 (UTC).

Haule v. Grassroots Leadership

Case Summary

On 07/19/2018 Haule filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Grassroots Leadership. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Andrew W. Austin and Robert Pitman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00606

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Andrew W. Austin

Presiding Judge

Robert Pitman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Margaret Haule

Austin, TX 78728

Defendant

Grassroots Leadership

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Margaret Haule.. Motions referred to Judge Andrew W. Austin. (cj) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

#4

(#4) ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Haule is ORDERED to file by September 15, 2018 a More Definite Statement. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (dm) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT, filed by Margaret Haule. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(cj) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

1 #1

Exhibit A

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Filing, Request for Alternative Dispute Resolution by Margaret Haule. (dm) (Entered: 07/23/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Haule is ORDERED to file by September 15, 2018 a More Definite Statement. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (dm) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Filing, Request for Alternative Dispute Resolution by Margaret Haule. (dm) (Entered: 07/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Andrew W. Austin. (cj) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Margaret Haule.. Motions referred to Judge Andrew W. Austin. (cj) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT, filed by Margaret Haule. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(cj) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less