This case was last updated from PACER on 09/29/2018 at 08:00:27 (UTC).

Harris v. Meves

Case Summary

On 07/31/2018 Harris filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Meves. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Nancy Joseph. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-01176

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nancy Joseph

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Durrell M Harris

Oshkosh, WI 54903-3310

Defendant

Mallory Meves

 

Court Documents

#1

(#19) TRANSMIT #18 Order, #1 Complaint, Notice, Waiver and Consent Form to USMS for service upon defendant. (blr)

#2

(#18) SCREENING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Harris's motion for leave to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee ( #2 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Harris's motions to amend the complaint (Docket #9 , #16 ) are DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the United States Marshal shall serve a copy of the complaint and this order upon Mallory Meves pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Mallory Meves shall file a responsive pleading to the complaint. (cc: all counsel, via US mail to Plaintiff & Warden at Oshkosh Correctional) (blr)

#3

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) LETTER from the Clerk to Durrell M Harris requesting that he submit the consent/refusal form for Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph within 21 days. Plaintiff must also submit his six-month certified trust account statement. (tlf)

#5

RESTRICTED

6 #1

Prisoner E-Filing Information Packet

#6

(#6) LETTER from the Clerk to Durrell M Harris regarding the Prisoner E-Filing Program. (cc: All Counsel) (Attachments: #1 Prisoner E-Filing Information Packet)(tlf)

#7

RESTRICTED

#8

(#8) ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph that on or before September 4, 2018 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $24.08 as an initial partial filing fee in this action. (cc: all counsel, via US mail to Plaintiff and Warden at Oshkosh Correctional)(blr)

#19

(#19) TRANSMIT #18 Order, #1 Complaint, Notice, Waiver and Consent Form to USMS for service upon defendant. (blr)

#18

(#18) SCREENING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Harris's motion for leave to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee ( #2 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Harris's motions to amend the complaint (Docket #9 , #16 ) are DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the United States Marshal shall serve a copy of the complaint and this order upon Mallory Meves pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Mallory Meves shall file a responsive pleading to the complaint. (cc: all counsel, via US mail to Plaintiff & Warden at Oshkosh Correctional) (blr)

#16

(#16) MOTION to Alter Complaint by Durrell M Harris. (lh)

#17

(#17) DECLARATION of Durrell Harris #5 (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C)(lh)

17 #1

Exhibits A-C

#15

(#15) DECLARATIONS #5 and #6 of Durrell Harris (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(mac)

15 #1

Exhibit

#14

(#14) DECLARATION #4 of Durrell M Harris. (tlf)

13 #1

Exhibits A-D

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) TRANSMIT #18 Order, #1 Complaint, Notice, Waiver and Consent Form to USMS for service upon defendant. (blr)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) SCREENING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Harris's motion for leave to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee ( #2 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Harris's motions to amend the complaint (Docket #9 , #16 ) are DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the United States Marshal shall serve a copy of the complaint and this order upon Mallory Meves pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Mallory Meves shall file a responsive pleading to the complaint. (cc: all counsel, via US mail to Plaintiff & Warden at Oshkosh Correctional) (blr)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) DECLARATION of Durrell Harris #5 (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C)(lh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MOTION to Alter Complaint by Durrell M Harris. (lh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) DECLARATIONS #5 and #6 of Durrell Harris (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(mac)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) DECLARATION #4 of Durrell M Harris. (tlf)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) DECLARATION #3 of Durrell M Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-D)(tlf)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) DECLARATION #2 of Durrell M Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(tlf)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) DECLARATION #1 of Durrell M Harris. (tlf)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Proposed Summons filed by Durrell M Harris. (mac)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE Received: $25, receipt number MK4689-073624. ; the payment of all future filing fees will be maintained by the financial department (jcl)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) (Unsigned) MOTION to Amend Complaint by Durrell M Harris. (lh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph that on or before September 4, 2018 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $24.08 as an initial partial filing fee in this action. (cc: all counsel, via US mail to Plaintiff and Warden at Oshkosh Correctional)(blr)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Durrell M Harris. (tlf)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) LETTER from the Clerk to Durrell M Harris regarding the Prisoner E-Filing Program. (cc: All Counsel) (Attachments: #1 Prisoner E-Filing Information Packet)(tlf)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Durrell M Harris. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (lh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) LETTER from the Clerk to Durrell M Harris requesting that he submit the consent/refusal form for Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph within 21 days. Plaintiff must also submit his six-month certified trust account statement. (tlf)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Durrell M Harris. (Canteen statement covering 2-week period.) (tlf)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Durrell M Harris. (tlf)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PRISONER COMPLAINT with jury demand filed against Mallory Meves by Durrell M Harris. (tlf)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.