This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/14/2018 at 07:11:40 (UTC).

Harris v. Metlife Securities Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2018 Harris filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against Metlife Securities Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory H. Woods. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-06412

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gregory H. Woods

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Eric Harris

Respondents

Metlife Securities Inc.

FINRA - Financial Regulatory Authority

MSI Financial Services, Inc.

FINRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Brittany Sloane Weiner

Attorney at Imbesi Law P.C.

450 7Th Avenue

New York, NY 10123

 

Court Documents

#25

(#25) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #20 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Eric Harris. (Weiner, Brittany) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

#24

(#24) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Motion for Summary Judgment served on Metlife, MSI, FINRA on 8/13/2018. Service was made by Email. Document filed by Eric Harris. (Weiner, Brittany) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

#23

(#23) RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Eric Harris. (Weiner, Brittany) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

22 #3

Exhibit Stipulations

22 #2

Exhibit Executed Award

22 #1

Exhibit Uniform Submission Agreements

#22

(#22) DECLARATION of Brittany Weiner in Support re: #20 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Eric Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Uniform Submission Agreements, #2 Exhibit Executed Award, #3 Exhibit Stipulations)(Weiner, Brittany) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

21 #1

Affidavit Affidavit of Petitioner Harris

#21

(#21) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #20 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Eric Harris. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Petitioner Harris)(Weiner, Brittany) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

#20

(#20) MOTION for Summary Judgment . Document filed by Eric Harris. Responses due by 9/6/2018(Weiner, Brittany) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

#5

(#5) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MetLife Securities, Inc., re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,. Document filed by Eric Harris. (Weiner, Brittany) Modified on 7/17/2018 (pne). (Entered: 07/16/2018)

#4

(#4) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MSI Financial Services Inc., re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,. Document filed by Eric Harris. (Weiner, Brittany) Modified on 7/17/2018 (pne). (Entered: 07/16/2018)

#3

(#3) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to FINRA, re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,. Document filed by Eric Harris. (Weiner, Brittany) Modified on 7/17/2018 (pne). (Entered: 07/16/2018)

#2

(#2) FILING ERROR - SIGNATURE ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Weiner, Brittany) Modified on 7/17/2018 (pne). (Entered: 07/16/2018)

1 #3

Exhibit Executed Award

1 #2

Affidavit Affidavit of Attorney Weiner

1 #1

Supplement MOL in support

#1

(#5) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MetLife Securities, Inc., re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,. Document filed by Eric Harris. (Weiner, Brittany) Modified on 7/17/2018 (pne). (Entered: 07/16/2018)

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #20 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Eric Harris. (Weiner, Brittany) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Motion for Summary Judgment served on Metlife, MSI, FINRA on 8/13/2018. Service was made by Email. Document filed by Eric Harris. (Weiner, Brittany) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Eric Harris. (Weiner, Brittany) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) DECLARATION of Brittany Weiner in Support re: #20 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Eric Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Uniform Submission Agreements, #2 Exhibit Executed Award, #3 Exhibit Stipulations)(Weiner, Brittany) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #20 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Eric Harris. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Petitioner Harris)(Weiner, Brittany) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) MOTION for Summary Judgment . Document filed by Eric Harris. Responses due by 9/6/2018(Weiner, Brittany) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 9/6/2018. Replies due by 9/13/2018. (anc) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that petitioner shall file and serve a statement pursuant to Local Civil Rule 56.1 and any additional materials with which it intends to support the petition, including any affidavits or declarations attesting that the exhibits to the petition are true and correct copies of what they purport to be, no later than August 23, 2018. Petitioner is further ordered to submit a supplemental memorandum of law in support of its petition no later than August 23, 2018. Respondents' opposition is due by September 6, 2018. Petitioner's reply, if any, is due by September 13, 2018. Petitioner is directed to serve the petition and supporting materials upon respondents by August 16, 2018 and to file an affidavit of such service with the Court by August 23, 2018. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 8/8/2018) (anc) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Eric Harris. (Weiner, Brittany) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. FINRA served on 7/30/2018, answer due 8/20/2018. Service was accepted by LEGAL REPRESENTATIVE OF CSC. Document filed by Eric Harris. (Weiner, Brittany) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 07/17/2018
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Brittany Sloane Weiner. The party information for the following party has been modified: FINRA. The information for the party has been modified for the following reason: party name contained a typographical error. (pne) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Brittany Sloane Weiner. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Citizenship Defendant code 1 (Citizen of This State); County code Albany; Fee Status code due (due). The following corrections have been made to your case entry: the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 4 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-This State); the County code has been modified to New York; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (pne) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • Case Designated ECF. (pne) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MetLife Securities, Inc., re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,. Document filed by Eric Harris. (Weiner, Brittany) Modified on 7/17/2018 (pne). (Entered: 07/16/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MSI Financial Services Inc., re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,. Document filed by Eric Harris. (Weiner, Brittany) Modified on 7/17/2018 (pne). (Entered: 07/16/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to FINRA, re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,. Document filed by Eric Harris. (Weiner, Brittany) Modified on 7/17/2018 (pne). (Entered: 07/16/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) FILING ERROR - SIGNATURE ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Weiner, Brittany) Modified on 7/17/2018 (pne). (Entered: 07/16/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15327777).Document filed by Eric Harris. (Attachments: #1 Supplement MOL in support, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Attorney Weiner, #3 Exhibit Executed Award)(Weiner, Brittany) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MSI Financial Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where FINRA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brittany Sloane Weiner