This case was last updated from PACER on 09/30/2018 at 07:23:27 (UTC).

Harris v. Medicredit, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/01/2018 Harris filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Medicredit, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John M. Bodenhausen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-01280

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John M. Bodenhausen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jason Harris, Jr.

Defendant

Medicredit, Inc.

1 N. Brentwood Blvd., Suite 1000

St. Louis, MO 63105

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Richard A. Voytas, Jr.

Attorney at ROSS AND VOYTAS, LLC

12444 Powerscourt Dr., Suite 370

St. Louis, MO 63131

Ethan William Gee

Attorney at ROSS AND VOYTAS, LLC

12444 Powerscourt Dr., Suite 370

St. Louis, MO 63131

Erika Victoria Dopuch

Attorney at ROSS AND VOYTAS, LLC

12444 Powerscourt Dr., Suite 370

St. Louis, MO 63131

Defendant Attorney

John D. Ryan

Attorney at SPENCER FANE LLP

1650 N. Kingshighway, Suite 204

Cape Girardeau, MO 63701

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2. Motion to Join Parties due by 10/5/2018. Discovery Completion due by 3/18/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 4/19/2019. Jury Trial set for 8/12/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 15S before Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 9/18/18. (ARL) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

#12

(#12) FULL CONSENT has been received by Plaintiff Jason Harris, Jr, Defendant Medicredit, Inc. (KEK) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

#11

(#11) ENTRY of Appearance by Erika Victoria Dopuch for Plaintiff Jason Harris, Jr. (Dopuch, Erika) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

#10

(#10) JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Jason Harris, Jr. . (Gee, Ethan) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

#9

(#9) ENTRY of Appearance by Ethan William Gee for Plaintiff Jason Harris, Jr. (Gee, Ethan) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

#8

(#8) ENTRY of Appearance by Richard A. Voytas, Jr for Plaintiff Jason Harris, Jr. (Voytas, Richard) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

#7

(#7) RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2 Joint Scheduling Plan due by 9/11/2018. Rule 16 Conference set for 9/18/2018 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 9/11/2018. [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS]. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 8/7/2018. (NEP) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

#5

(#5) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Medicredit, Inc.. Parent companies: The Outsource Group,. (Ryan, John) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by Medicredit, Inc..(Ryan, John) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Medicredit, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (MFG) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

#2

(#2) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis County, filed by Jason Harris, Jr.(MFG) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

1 #5

Exhibit

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Original Filing Form

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with receipt number 0865-6676186, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Medicredit, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Ryan, John) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2. Motion to Join Parties due by 10/5/2018. Discovery Completion due by 3/18/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 4/19/2019. Jury Trial set for 8/12/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 15S before Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 9/18/18. (ARL) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • (#13) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen: Rule 16 Conference held on 9/18/2018. Conference held by phone and in person. CMO to issue. (Notice only, no.pdf attached.). (FTR Gold: No) (ARL) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) FULL CONSENT has been received by Plaintiff Jason Harris, Jr, Defendant Medicredit, Inc. (KEK) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ENTRY of Appearance by Erika Victoria Dopuch for Plaintiff Jason Harris, Jr. (Dopuch, Erika) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Jason Harris, Jr. . (Gee, Ethan) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ENTRY of Appearance by Ethan William Gee for Plaintiff Jason Harris, Jr. (Gee, Ethan) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ENTRY of Appearance by Richard A. Voytas, Jr for Plaintiff Jason Harris, Jr. (Voytas, Richard) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2 Joint Scheduling Plan due by 9/11/2018. Rule 16 Conference set for 9/18/2018 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 9/11/2018. [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS]. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 8/7/2018. (NEP) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • (#6) Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Medicredit, Inc.. Parent companies: The Outsource Group,. (Ryan, John) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to Complaint by Medicredit, Inc..(Ryan, John) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable John M. Bodenhausen. (MFG) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Medicredit, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (MFG) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis County, filed by Jason Harris, Jr.(MFG) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with receipt number 0865-6676186, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Medicredit, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Ryan, John) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.