This case was last updated from PACER on 10/07/2018 at 07:53:40 (UTC).

Harris, Sammie v. Betthauser, Charles et al

Case Summary

On 08/08/2018 Harris, Sammie filed a Prisoner - Mandamus lawsuit against Betthauser, Charles. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are William M. Conley and Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00655

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Mandamus

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William M. Conley

Referral Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sammie Jerwan Harris

Green Bay, WI 54307-9033

Defendants

Charles D Betthauser

Judge Anna Becker

Not Classified By Court

GBCI Prison Facility

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) LETTER from the Clerk to Sammie Jerwan Harris regarding the Prisoner E-Filing Program. (cc: All Counsel) (Attachments: #1 Prisoner E-Filing Information Packet)(tlf) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 8/8/2018.] (Entered: 07/26/2018)

#10

(#10) ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff Sammie Jerwan Harris assessed an initial partial filing fee of $2.11 due 9/5/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 8/14/2018. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

#11

(#11) Notice from the Clerk regarding the Prisoner E-Filing Program. (Attachments: #1 Prisoner E-filing Information Packet) (nln),(ps) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

8 #1

*Restricted*

3 #1

Prisoner E-Filing Information Packet

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) Order signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 8/7/2018 Transferring Venue to the United States District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin. (cc: all counsel and copy sent to the plaintiff by US Mail on 8/7/2018)(kgw) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 8/8/2018.] (Entered: 08/07/2018)

#8

(#8) Case transferred in from District of Wisconsin Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-01110. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (lak) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

#6

(#6) LETTER from Sammie Harris. (lh) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 8/8/2018.] (Entered: 08/07/2018)

#7

RESTRICTED

#1

(#1) PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Sammie Jerwan Harris(vkb) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 8/8/2018.] (Entered: 07/19/2018)

11 #1

Prisoner E-filing Information Packet

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee filed by plaintiff Sammie Jerwan Harris (vkb) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 8/8/2018.] (Entered: 07/19/2018)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2018
  • Civil case terminated for plaintiff's failure to pay initial partial filing fee. No fee is owed for filing this case. (elc),(ps) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Notice from the Clerk regarding the Prisoner E-Filing Program. (Attachments: #1 Prisoner E-filing Information Packet) (nln),(ps) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff Sammie Jerwan Harris assessed an initial partial filing fee of $2.11 due 9/5/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 8/14/2018. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Sammie Jerwan Harris. (nln),(ps) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/14/2018: #1 IPP Calculation) (nln). (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Case transferred in from District of Wisconsin Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-01110. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (lak) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Sammie Jerwan Harris. (lh) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 8/8/2018.] (Entered: 08/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) LETTER from Sammie Harris. (lh) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 8/8/2018.] (Entered: 08/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Sammie Jerwan Harris. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (lh) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 8/8/2018.] (Entered: 08/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 8/7/2018 Transferring Venue to the United States District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin. (cc: all counsel and copy sent to the plaintiff by US Mail on 8/7/2018)(kgw) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 8/8/2018.] (Entered: 08/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) LETTER from the Clerk to Sammie Jerwan Harris regarding the Prisoner E-Filing Program. (cc: All Counsel) (Attachments: #1 Prisoner E-Filing Information Packet)(tlf) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 8/8/2018.] (Entered: 07/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • NOTICE from the clerk mailed to plaintiff requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Duffin be filed within 21 days; also requesting a copy of his six-month certified trust account statement (vkb) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 8/8/2018.] (Entered: 07/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee filed by plaintiff Sammie Jerwan Harris (vkb) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 8/8/2018.] (Entered: 07/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Sammie Jerwan Harris(vkb) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 8/8/2018.] (Entered: 07/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.