This case was last updated from PACER on 12/01/2018 at 07:57:56 (UTC).

Harper v. Clark

Case Summary

On 10/02/2018 Harper filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Clark. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert J. Krask and Robert G. Doumar. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00522

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Robert J. Krask

Presiding Judge

Robert G. Doumar

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Christopher Durene Harper

Pound, VA 24279

Respondent

Herald Clark

 

Court Documents

#4

RESTRICTED

1 #1

Envelope

#3

(#3) Letter to Warden, Red Onion State Prison. (jmey, ) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

#2

RESTRICTED

#1

(#1) PETITION, Conditionally filed for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 0.00.), filed by Christopher Durene Harper. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (2 service copies provided.)(jmey, ) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement. (jmey, ) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Letter to Warden, Red Onion State Prison. (jmey, ) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Christopher Durene Harper. (jmey, ) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION, Conditionally filed for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 0.00.), filed by Christopher Durene Harper. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (2 service copies provided.)(jmey, ) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.