This case was last updated from PACER on 01/20/2019 at 08:12:08 (UTC).

Harness et al v. Walmart, Inc. et al (TV2)

Case Summary

On 11/21/2018 Harness filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Walmart, Inc TV2. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas A Varlan and Debra C Poplin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00493

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas A Varlan

Referral Judge

Debra C Poplin

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Brandon Harness

Deanna Harness

Defendants

Optimus Enterprise, Inc.

Walmart, Inc.

Overseas Connection, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Glen B Rutherford

Attorney at Rutherford Weinstein Law Group PLLC

418 S Gay St Ste 204

Knoxville, TN 37902

Defendant Attorneys

Steven D Parman

Attorney at Watkins & McNeilly, PLLC

214 Second Avenue North, Suite 300

Nashville, TN 37201

Elle G Kern

Attorney at Howell & Fisher PLLC

300 James Robertson Parkway, Court Square Building

Nashville, TN 37201-1107

George A Rowlett

Attorney at Howell & Fisher PLLC

3310 West End Avenue, Suite 550

Nashville, TN 37203-1089

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by Deanna Harness (Rutherford, Glen) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Change of Address by George A Rowlett (Rowlett, George) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

13 #1

Other Envelope

#13

(#13) Letter from Anderson County Clerk re: Certified Copies of State Court Records in B8LA0163 (Attachments: #1 Other Envelope) (KMK) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

12 #1

Other Notice

#12

(#12) NOTICE OF CONSENT by Deanna Harness (Attachments: #1 Other Notice)(Rutherford, Glen) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

11 #1

Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent

#11

(#11) ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 12/7/18. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (ABF) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to Complaint by Overseas Connection, Inc..(Parman, Steven) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. The Court ORDERS Overseas Connection to file a responsive pleading on or before December 10, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin on 12/3/18. (ABF) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer on Behalf of Overseas by Optimus Enterprise, Inc.. (Parman, Steven) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by Optimus Enterprise, Inc..(Parman, Steven) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

#6

(#6) Defendant Walmart, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint by Walmart, Inc..(Kern, Elle) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

#5

(#5) Order Governing Sealing Confidential InformationSigned by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 11/21/2018. (DJH, ) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

#4

(#4) Order Governing DepositionsSigned by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 11/21/2018. (DJH, ) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

#3

(#3) Order Governing Motions To DismissSigned by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 11/21/2018. (DJH, ) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

#2

(#2) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Walmart, Inc.. (Kern, Elle) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

1 #2

Summons Ex. B - Optimus Summons

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by Deanna Harness (Rutherford, Glen) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Change of Address by George A Rowlett (Rowlett, George) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Letter from Anderson County Clerk re: Certified Copies of State Court Records in B8LA0163 (Attachments: #1 Other Envelope) (KMK) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE OF CONSENT by Deanna Harness (Attachments: #1 Other Notice)(Rutherford, Glen) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 12/7/18. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (ABF) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ANSWER to Complaint by Overseas Connection, Inc..(Parman, Steven) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. The Court ORDERS Overseas Connection to file a responsive pleading on or before December 10, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin on 12/3/18. (ABF) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer on Behalf of Overseas by Optimus Enterprise, Inc.. (Parman, Steven) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to Complaint by Optimus Enterprise, Inc..(Parman, Steven) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Defendant Walmart, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint by Walmart, Inc..(Kern, Elle) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order Governing Sealing Confidential InformationSigned by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 11/21/2018. (DJH, ) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order Governing DepositionsSigned by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 11/21/2018. (DJH, ) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order Governing Motions To DismissSigned by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 11/21/2018. (DJH, ) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (DJH, ) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Walmart, Inc.. (Kern, Elle) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Anderson County Circuit Court, case number B8LA0163. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3823881), filed by Walmart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Ex. A - WM Summons, #2 Summons Ex. B - Optimus Summons, #3 Summons Ex. C - Overseas Summons, #4 Exhibit Ex. D - Complaint, #5 Other Affidavit of Elle Kern, #6 Other Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #7 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Kern, Elle) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.