This case was last updated from PACER on 12/25/2018 at 07:52:33 (UTC).

Hardy v. Hobbs

Case Summary

On 10/26/2018 Hardy filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Hobbs. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is Gray M. Borden. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00916

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gray M. Borden

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Russell Haynes Hardy

Defendant

Jefferson T. Hobbs

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Davis Lawson Middlemas, Sr.

Attorney at Morris Bart & Associates LLC

420 North 20Th Street; Suite 2750

Birmingham, AL 35203

Matthew Burnick

Attorney at Morris Bart and Assoc

420 20Th St N - Ste 2750

Birmingham, AL 35203

Defendant Attorneys

Brad Anthony Everhardt

Attorney at Hill, Hill, Carter, Franco, Cole & Black, P.C.

P O Box 116

Montgomery, AL 36101

David Wayne Henderson

Attorney at Hill Hill Carter Franco Cole & Black

425 South Perry Street

Montgomery, AL 36104

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement re #3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement by by Russell Haynes Hardy. (Middlemas, Davis) Modified on 12/19/2018 to create the docket entry relationship. (kh, ). (Entered: 12/18/2018)

#8

(#8) ORDERED that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, but no later than December 28, 2018. Accordingly, counsel for the parties are DIRECTED to complete and to send to the Clerk of Court the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk of Court on or before December 28, 2018. CONSENT FORMS MAY NOW BE SUBMITTED ELECTRONICALLY TO THE CLERK OF THE COURT. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 12/4/2018. (kh, ) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

#6

(#6) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement re #4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement by Jefferson T. Hobbs. (Everhardt, Brad) Modified on 11/2/2018 to create the docket entry relationship(kh, ). (Entered: 11/01/2018)

#5

(#5) Jefferson T. Hobbs ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Jefferson T. Hobbs.(Everhardt, Brad) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

4 #1

Corporate/Conflict Attachment

#4

(#4) Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Jefferson T. Hobbs. Corporate Disclosures due by 11/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Attachment)(kh, ) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

3 #1

Corporate/Conflict Attachment

#3

(#3) Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Russell Haynes Hardy Corporate Disclosures due by 11/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Attachment)(kh, ) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Russell Haynes Hardy, Jefferson T. Hobbs (kh, ) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

1 #5

Filing Fee Receipt

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

State Court Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jefferson T. Hobbs from Circuit Court of Montgomery County, Alabama, case number 03-cv-2018-901654.00. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602051191) (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Filing Fee Receipt)(kh, ) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement re #3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement by by Russell Haynes Hardy. (Middlemas, Davis) Modified on 12/19/2018 to create the docket entry relationship. (kh, ). (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDERED that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, but no later than December 28, 2018. Accordingly, counsel for the parties are DIRECTED to complete and to send to the Clerk of Court the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk of Court on or before December 28, 2018. CONSENT FORMS MAY NOW BE SUBMITTED ELECTRONICALLY TO THE CLERK OF THE COURT. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 12/4/2018. (kh, ) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by David Wayne Henderson on behalf of Jefferson T. Hobbs (Henderson, David) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement re #4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement by Jefferson T. Hobbs. (Everhardt, Brad) Modified on 11/2/2018 to create the docket entry relationship(kh, ). (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Jefferson T. Hobbs ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Jefferson T. Hobbs.(Everhardt, Brad) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Jefferson T. Hobbs. Corporate Disclosures due by 11/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Attachment)(kh, ) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Russell Haynes Hardy Corporate Disclosures due by 11/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Attachment)(kh, ) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Russell Haynes Hardy, Jefferson T. Hobbs (kh, ) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Russell Haynes Hardy. (no pdf document attached to this entry see docket entry #1 for pdf) (kh, ) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT against Jefferson T. Hobbs, filed by Russell Haynes Hardy.(no pdf document attached to this entry see docket entry #1 for pdf) (kh, ) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jefferson T. Hobbs from Circuit Court of Montgomery County, Alabama, case number 03-cv-2018-901654.00. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602051191) (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Filing Fee Receipt)(kh, ) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less