This case was last updated from PACER on 02/17/2018 at 07:09:05 (UTC).

Hardy v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al

Case Summary

On 02/16/2018 Hardy filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Karen K. Caldwell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-00112

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karen K. Caldwell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Angela Hardy

Defendants

Bristol-Myers Squibb Company

AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP

McKesson Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Randi Alyson Kassan

Attorney at Sanders Phillips Grossman, LLC

100 Garden City Plaza, Suite 500

Garden City, NY 11530

Bryan F. Aylstock

Attorney at Aylstock Witkin Kreis & Overholtz

17 East Main Street, Suite 200

Pensacola, FL 32502

Timothy Michael Clark

Attorney at Sanders Phillips Grossman, LLC

2860 Michelle Drive, Suite 220

Irvine, CA 92807

Defendant Attorneys

Harlan Irby Prater, IV

Attorney at Lightfoot Franklin & White LLC

400 N 20Th Street, The Clark Building

Birmingham, AL 35203

Tenley Armstrong

Attorney at Lightfoot Franklin & White LLC

400 N 20Th Street, The Clark Building

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

16 #1

*Restricted*

#16

(#16) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Alabama Northern. Case number 2:17-cv-02024. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received electronically. cc COR w/ copy of docket sheet to non-registered attorneys (Entered: 02/16/2018)

#15

(#15) ORDER Transferring Case to MDL: ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the District of Kentucky, Eastern for inclusion in MDL; certified copy of docket entries and documents requested by transferee clerk electronically transmitted to Clerk of Court in District of Kentucky, Eastern. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 2/15/18. (SAC, ) [Transferred from alnd on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 02/15/2018)

#14

(#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Angela Hardy. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company served on 1/5/2018, answer due 1/26/2018. (Kassan, Randi) [Transferred from alnd on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 01/23/2018)

#13

(#13) INITIAL ORDER Governing All Further Proceedings - with appendices attached. **The report also should contain a synopsis of the case advising the court of the general claims and defenses of the parties. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 1/12/2018. (FNC) [Transferred from alnd on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 01/12/2018)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by McKesson Corporation.(Armstrong, Tenley) [Transferred from alnd on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 01/12/2018)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company.(Armstrong, Tenley) [Transferred from alnd on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 01/12/2018)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP.(Armstrong, Tenley) [Transferred from alnd on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 01/12/2018)

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company (Armstrong, Tenley) [Transferred from alnd on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 01/12/2018)

#7

(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP. filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP (Armstrong, Tenley) [Transferred from alnd on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 01/12/2018)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Angela Hardy. AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP served on 12/22/2017, answer due 1/12/2018. (Aylstock, Bryan) [Transferred from alnd on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 01/11/2018)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Angela Hardy. McKesson Corporation served on 12/27/2017, answer due 1/17/2018. (Aylstock, Bryan) [Transferred from alnd on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 01/11/2018)

2 #2

Text of Proposed Order

2 #1

Exhibit A (Certificate of Good Standing)

#2

(#4) TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Randi Kassan. The court advises counsel that it may require at least one attorney for each party to be physically present at every hearing and status conference. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 12/21/2017. (JWD) [Transferred from alnd on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 12/21/2017)

#1

(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP.(Armstrong, Tenley) [Transferred from alnd on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 01/12/2018)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2018
  • REMARK: Counsel shall refer to #www.kyed.uscourts.gov/518-md-02809-kkc for review of Orders relative to filing procedures in MDL 2809. If you are not registered as an ECF Filing User, please complete the ECF Registration Form and return it to the Clerk within twenty-one (21) days. cc: Order Regarding Practice & Procedure upon Transfer filed February 9, 2018 served via U.S. Mail to counsel not registered as ECF Filing Users. (CBD) (Entered: 02/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • Conflict Check run. (CBD) (Entered: 02/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Alabama Northern. Case number 2:17-cv-02024. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received electronically. cc COR w/ copy of docket sheet to non-registered attorneys (Entered: 02/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER Transferring Case to MDL: ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the District of Kentucky, Eastern for inclusion in MDL; certified copy of docket entries and documents requested by transferee clerk electronically transmitted to Clerk of Court in District of Kentucky, Eastern. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 2/15/18. (SAC, ) [Transferred from alnd on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 02/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Angela Hardy. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company served on 1/5/2018, answer due 1/26/2018. (Kassan, Randi) [Transferred from alnd on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 01/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) INITIAL ORDER Governing All Further Proceedings - with appendices attached. **The report also should contain a synopsis of the case advising the court of the general claims and defenses of the parties. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 1/12/2018. (FNC) [Transferred from alnd on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 01/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement by McKesson Corporation. filed by McKesson Corporation (Armstrong, Tenley) [Transferred from alnd on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 01/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by McKesson Corporation.(Armstrong, Tenley) [Transferred from alnd on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 01/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company.(Armstrong, Tenley) [Transferred from alnd on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 01/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP.(Armstrong, Tenley) [Transferred from alnd on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 01/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company (Armstrong, Tenley) [Transferred from alnd on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 01/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP. filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP (Armstrong, Tenley) [Transferred from alnd on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 01/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Angela Hardy. AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP served on 12/22/2017, answer due 1/12/2018. (Aylstock, Bryan) [Transferred from alnd on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 01/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Angela Hardy. McKesson Corporation served on 12/27/2017, answer due 1/17/2018. (Aylstock, Bryan) [Transferred from alnd on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 01/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Randi Kassan. The court advises counsel that it may require at least one attorney for each party to be physically present at every hearing and status conference. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 12/21/2017. (JWD) [Transferred from alnd on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 12/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • PHV Fee paid: $ 50, ALND receipt#: B4601085480/ receipt number 1126-2993121. (Aylstock, Bryan) Modified on 12/26/2017 (SAC ). [Transferred from alnd on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 12/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation. Delivered to pla. (in UPS return envelope provided by pla.) for service. (PSM) [Transferred from alnd on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 12/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Randi Kassan) by Angela Hardy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Certificate of Good Standing), #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Aylstock, Bryan) [Transferred from alnd on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 12/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, ALND receipt#: B4601085012/ receipt_number 1126-2982959. related document #1 COMPLAINT against AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation, filed by Angela Hardy.(SAC ). (Aylstock, Bryan) Modified on 12/5/2017 (SAC, ). [Transferred from alnd on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 12/04/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation, filed by Angela Hardy.(SAC ) [Transferred from alnd on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 12/04/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less