This case was last updated from PACER on 01/29/2019 at 07:59:55 (UTC).

Harbour et al v. Sirico et al

Case Summary

On 11/30/2018 Harbour filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Sirico. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are John W. deGravelles and Erin Wilder-Doomes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-01055

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John W. deGravelles

Referral Judge

Erin Wilder-Doomes

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Tasman Holdings, LLC

Michael Harbour

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Louis Anthony Sirico

Lisa Grace Loud

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Brett P. Furr

Attorney at Taylor, Porter, Brooks & Phillips

P. O. Box 2471

Baton Rouge, LA 70821

Ashley Carver Meredith

Attorney at Taylor Porter Brooks & Phillips LLP

450 Laurel Street, 8Th Floor

Baton Rouge, LA 70801

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Jennifer Ann Fiore

Attorney at Dunlap Fiore, LLC

6700 Jefferson Highway, Building #2

Baton Rouge, LA 70806

Quinn Kelcie Brown

Attorney at Manion Gaynor & Manning LLP

365 Canal Street, Suite 3000

New Orleans, LA 70130

John B. Dunlap, III

Attorney at Dunlap Fiore, L.L.C.

6700 Jefferson Highway, Building #2

Baton Rouge, LA 70806

Hunter Ryan Bertrand

Attorney at Dunlap Fiore, LLC

6700 Jefferson Highway, Building #2

Baton Rouge, LA 70806

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) MOTION to Set Aside Default by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Pleading;)(Bertrand, Hunter) (Entered: 01/21/2019)

12 #4

Proposed Pleading;

12 #3

Exhibit B

12 #1

Memorandum in Support

12 #2

Exhibit A

13 #1

Proposed Pleading;

#13

(#13) MOTION to Continue Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Default Judgment by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;)(Bertrand, Hunter) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

9 #2

Proposed Pleading; Order

9 #1

Exhibit Ltr to Defendants

#9

(#9) MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference, or in the Alternative, MOTION for Leave to File Separate Status Report by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ltr to Defendants, #2 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Meredith, Ashley). Added MOTION for Leave to File on 1/17/2019 (NLT). (Entered: 01/17/2019)

#10

(#10) Verified COUNTERCLAIM, ANSWER, AND Affirmative Defenses against All Plaintiffs by Lisa Grace Loud, Louis Anthony Sirico. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Bertrand, Hunter) Modified on 1/18/2019 to edit the text (SWE). (Entered: 01/17/2019)

10 #6

Exhibit E

10 #4

Exhibit C

10 #5

Exhibit D

10 #2

Exhibit A

10 #3

Exhibit B

10 #1

Verification

7 #10

Proposed Pleading; Final Judgment

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of Briefing Schedule on #12 MOTION to Set Aside Default : Opposition to the motion shall be filed within 21 days from the filing of the motion and shall not exceed 10 pages excluding attachments. The mover may file a reply brief within 14 days of the filing of the opposition and shall be limited to a total of 5 pages. No motion for leave will be required. Sur-Reply briefs will be permitted only with leave of Court for extraordinary reasons supported by sufficient facts. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KDC) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER granting #13 Motion to Continue the hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Default Judgment pending the Court's consideration of Defendants' Motion to Set Aside the Clerk's Entry of Default [Dkt. 12]. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 1/22/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KDC) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION to Continue Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Default Judgment by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;)(Bertrand, Hunter) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION to Set Aside Default by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Pleading;)(Bertrand, Hunter) (Entered: 01/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER granting in part the #9 Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference, or in the Alternative, Motion for Leave to File Separate Status Report. Status Report due by 2/21/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 3/7/2019 at 03:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 1/18/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Verified COUNTERCLAIM, ANSWER, AND Affirmative Defenses against All Plaintiffs by Lisa Grace Loud, Louis Anthony Sirico. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Bertrand, Hunter) Modified on 1/18/2019 to edit the text (SWE). (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #9 MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference, or in the Alternative, Motion for Leave to File Separate Status Report MOTION for Leave to File Separate Status Report. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (NLT) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference, or in the Alternative, MOTION for Leave to File Separate Status Report by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ltr to Defendants, #2 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Meredith, Ashley). Added MOTION for Leave to File on 1/17/2019 (NLT). (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Hearing on #7 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Louis Anthony Sirico and Lisa Grace Loud : Motion Hearing set for 1/23/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge John W. deGravelles. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KDC) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Louis Anthony Sirico and Lisa Grace Loud by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit B-1, #4 Exhibit B-2, #5 Exhibit B-3, #6 Exhibit B-4, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Memorandum in Support, #10 Proposed Pleading; Final Judgment)(Meredith, Ashley) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Lisa Grace Loud, Louis Anthony Sirico (SWE) . Modified on 12/19/2018 to replace document with signature(SWE). (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Louis Anthony Sirico and Lisa Grace Loud by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Clerk's Order for Entry of Default, #3 Certificate of Service)(Meredith, Ashley) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 2/7/2019 at 11:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 1/24/2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/17/2018. (NLT) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Michael Harbour, Tasman Holdings, LLC, filed by Lisa Grace Loud, Louis Anthony Sirico.(EDC) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE AND ORDER: Louis Anthony Sirico and Lisa Grace Loud shall file a Motion to Substitute the Notice of Removal with a comprehensive Amended Notice of Removal that adequately alleges the citizenship of Tasman Holdings, LLC. Amended Pleadings due by 12/17/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/3/2018. (SWE) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court, Case Number 675441. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 4699028849), filed by Lisa Grace Loud, Louis Anthony Sirico. (Attachments: #1 civil cover sheet, #2 Attachment, #3 Attachment, #4 envelope)(EDC) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.