This case was last updated from PACER on 11/03/2018 at 07:53:00 (UTC).

Hannah International Foods, Inc. v. House of Thaller, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/04/2018 Hannah International Foods, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against House of Thaller, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Harry S Mattice, Jr and H Bruce Guyton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00361

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Harry S Mattice, Jr

H Bruce Guyton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Hannah International Foods, Inc.

Defendant and Counter Claimant

House of Thaller, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Arnold Rosenblatt

Attorney at Cook, Little, Rosenblatt & Manson, PLLC

1000 Elm St, 20Th Flr

Manchester, NH 03101

Mary E Maddox

Attorney at Frantz, McConnell & Seymour, LLP

550 West Main Avenue, Suite 500

Knoxville, TN 37902

Kathleen M Mahan

Attorney at Cook, Little, Rosenblatt & Manson, PLLC

1000 Elm Street, 20Th Floor

Manchester, NH 03101

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Charles G Taylor, III

Attorney at McDonald, Levy & Taylor

10805 Kingston Pike, Suite 200

Knoxville, TN 37922-3018

Mark L. Mallory

Attorney at Mallory & Friedman PLLC

3 North Spring St, Ste 201

Concord, NH 03302

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Exhibit Summons and Complaint

#1

NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, filed by House of Thaller, Inc. LR 7.1.1. In removal actions, a nongovernmental corporate plaintiff, partnership plaintiff, or LLC plaintiff must file a disclosure statement within twenty-one (21) days from the date the notice of removal is filed or with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, objection, or request, whichever is filed sooner. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Hannah International Foods, Inc. shall file a disclosure statement by February 9, 2018. Disclosure Statement due 2/9/2018. (lml) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 9/4/2018.] (Entered: 01/19/2018)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit Notice of Removal to State Court Clerk

1 #2

Exhibit Notice of Removal to Counsel

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Consent Form sent to all parties. (lml) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 9/4/2018.] (Entered: 01/19/2018)

#3

(#3) Disclosure Statement by House of Thaller, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Mallory, Mark) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 9/4/2018.] (Entered: 01/19/2018)

4 #1

Exhibit (Affidavit) of Charles G. Taylor, III

#4

ENDORSED ORDER granting #4 Assented to MOTION for Charles G. Taylor, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Charles G. Taylor, III submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. ECF Registration Deadline set for 2/5/2018.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(kad) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 9/4/2018.] (Entered: 01/26/2018)

#37

(#37) CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE and ORDER REFERRING CASE. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 10/23/2018. (AML, ) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

#36

(#36) NOTICE OF CONSENT by House of Thaller, Inc (Taylor, Charles) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

#35

(#35) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Hannah International Foods, Inc.. (Maddox, Mary) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

#26

(#34) Plaintiff Hannah International Food, Inc.'s ANSWER to #26 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Hannah International Foods, Inc..(Maddox, Mary) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

#34

(#34) Plaintiff Hannah International Food, Inc.'s ANSWER to #26 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Hannah International Foods, Inc..(Maddox, Mary) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

#32

(#32) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kathleen Mahan ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3770848.) by Hannah International Foods, Inc.. (Maddox, Mary) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

#31

(#31) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Arnold Rosenblatt ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3770838.) by Hannah International Foods, Inc.. (Maddox, Mary) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

#30

(#30) NOTICE of Appearance by Mary E Maddox on behalf of Hannah International Foods, Inc. (Maddox, Mary) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

#28

(#29) ORDER granting #28 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Mark Mallory is RELIEVED of his duties as counsel in this matter, and Attorney Charles Taylor will continue his representation of Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 9/13/18. (ABF) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE and ORDER REFERRING CASE. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 10/23/2018. (AML, ) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) NOTICE OF CONSENT by House of Thaller, Inc (Taylor, Charles) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Hannah International Foods, Inc.. (Maddox, Mary) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) Plaintiff Hannah International Food, Inc.'s ANSWER to #26 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Hannah International Foods, Inc..(Maddox, Mary) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) ORDER granting #31 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #32 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Bruce Guyton on 9/19/2018. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court). (AGA) Modified on 9/20/2018 to indicate c/m to Arnold Rosenblatt and Kathleen Mahan (ABF). (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #31 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Arnold Rosenblatt ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3770838.) filed by Hannah International Foods, Inc., #32 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kathleen Mahan ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3770848.) filed by Hannah International Foods, Inc. (ABF) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kathleen Mahan ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3770848.) by Hannah International Foods, Inc.. (Maddox, Mary) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Arnold Rosenblatt ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3770838.) by Hannah International Foods, Inc.. (Maddox, Mary) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) NOTICE of Appearance by Mary E Maddox on behalf of Hannah International Foods, Inc. (Maddox, Mary) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) ORDER granting #28 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Mark Mallory is RELIEVED of his duties as counsel in this matter, and Attorney Charles Taylor will continue his representation of Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 9/13/18. (ABF) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 01/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ENDORSED ORDER granting #4 Assented to MOTION for Charles G. Taylor, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Charles G. Taylor, III submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. ECF Registration Deadline set for 2/5/2018.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(kad) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 9/4/2018.] (Entered: 01/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of ECF Filing Error INFORMATION ONLY - NO ACTION REQUIRED re: #4 Assented to MOTION for Charles G. Taylor, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1613850.) filed by House of Thaller, Inc. Consistent with Supplemental Rules of Electronic Case Filing, affidavits prepared in the context of the litigation shall be filed in electronically converted PDF format and shall contain a /s/ signature for both the signator and the notary/jurat. NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1423.(kad) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 9/4/2018.] (Entered: 01/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Assented to MOTION for Charles G. Taylor, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1613850.) filed by House of Thaller, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) of Charles G. Taylor, III)(Mallory, Mark) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 9/4/2018.] (Entered: 01/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Disclosure Statement by House of Thaller, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Mallory, Mark) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 9/4/2018.] (Entered: 01/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, filed by House of Thaller, Inc. LR 7.1.1. In removal actions, a nongovernmental corporate plaintiff, partnership plaintiff, or LLC plaintiff must file a disclosure statement within twenty-one (21) days from the date the notice of removal is filed or with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, objection, or request, whichever is filed sooner. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Hannah International Foods, Inc. shall file a disclosure statement by February 9, 2018. Disclosure Statement due 2/9/2018. (lml) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 9/4/2018.] (Entered: 01/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, filed by House of Thaller, Inc. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. House of Thaller, Inc. shall file a disclosure statement by January 25, 2018. Disclosure Statement due 1/25/2018. (lml) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 9/4/2018.] (Entered: 01/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE.(lml) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 9/4/2018.] (Entered: 01/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Consent Form sent to all parties. (lml) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 9/4/2018.] (Entered: 01/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-52-AJ. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (lml) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 9/4/2018.] (Entered: 01/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Rockingham County Superior Court, case number 218-2017-CV-01451 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0102-1611395) filed by House of Thaller, Inc.. Answer Follow Up on 2/9/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 2/2/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Notice of Removal to Counsel, #3 Exhibit Notice of Removal to State Court Clerk, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mallory, Mark) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 9/4/2018.] (Entered: 01/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.