This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/01/2019 at 07:24:19 (UTC).

Hankins v. US ROF II Legal Title Trust 2015-1 et al

Case Summary

On 11/02/2018 Hankins filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against US ROF II Legal Title Trust 2015-1. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald B. Leighton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-05896

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ronald B. Leighton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kim M Hankins

Anchorage, AK 99504

Defendants

Quality Loan Service Corporation of Washington

US ROF II Legal Title Trust 2015-1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Robert W McDonald

Attorney at QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORP.

108 1St Avenue S., #202

Seattle, WA 98104

Laura Nichole Coughlin

Attorney at WRIGHT FINLAY & ZAK LLP

3600 15Th Ave West, Ste 202

Seattle, WA 98119

 

Court Documents

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

6 #5

Notice of Appearance US Bank

6 #4

Notice of Appearance Quality Loan

6 #3

Motion for Temporary Restraining Order

6 #2

Amended Summons and Complaint

6 #1

Summons and Complaint

#6

#5

#4

1 #4

Exhibit 3 - Consent

1 #3

Exhibit 2 - Docket

1 #2

Exhibit 1 - Amended Complaint

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 2/4/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/22/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/28/2019, by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) Modified on 11/15/2018 (DN). (cc to pltf) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) Modified on 11/15/2018 (DN). (cc to pltf) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • DocketJudge Ronald B. Leighton added. Case reassigned to Judge Ronald B. Leighton for all further proceedings as related to 17-CV-05142-RBL. Counsel shall modify all future pleadings to reflect this change. Entered as authorized by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (SP) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • DocketJudge Benjamin H. Settle no longer assigned to case. (SP) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Related Case(s) 17-CV-05142-RBL, by Defendant US ROF II Legal Title Trust 2015-1. (Coughlin, Laura) (Entered: 11/12/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Bankcorp for US ROF II Legal Title Trust 2015-1. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by US ROF II Legal Title Trust 2015-1 (Coughlin, Laura) (Entered: 11/12/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STATE COURT RECORD Certificate of Service of Quality's Notice of Appearance filed in Mason County Superior Court Case No. 18-2-00524-23 Hankins v. Quality Loan Service Corp. filed by Defendant US ROF II Legal Title Trust 2015-1. (Coughlin, Laura) (Entered: 11/12/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STATE COURT RECORD of Mason County Superior Case No. 18-2-00524-23 Hankins v. Quality Loan Service Corp. filed by Defendant US ROF II Legal Title Trust 2015-1. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Amended Summons and Complaint, #3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, #4 Notice of Appearance Quality Loan, #5 Notice of Appearance US Bank)(Coughlin, Laura) (Entered: 11/12/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 2/4/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/22/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/28/2019. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC) cc: Pltf (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Quality Loan Service Corporation of Washington (McDonald, Robert) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (KB) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • DocketNOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendants must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 11/13/2018. (KB) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from Mason County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. cc pro se pltf via US Mail. (KB) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • DocketJudge Benjamin H. Settle added. (KB) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Mason County Superior Court, case number 18-2-00524-23; (Receipt # 0981-5530703), filed by US ROF II Legal Title Trust 2015-1. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 - Docket, #4 Exhibit 3 - Consent)(Coughlin, Laura) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less