This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/07/2019 at 07:16:15 (UTC).

Handler v. One Jet, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/08/2018 Handler filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against One Jet, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Solomon Oliver, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-02582

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Solomon Oliver, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Aaron Handler

Defendants

Matthew R. Maguire

One Jet, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Patrick J. Krebs

Jennifer B. Orr

Daniel H. Bryan

Defendant Attorneys

Justine L. Konicki

Jon J. Pinney

 

Court Documents

9 #1

Exhibit 1 - 12/6/18 e-mail

#9

#8

7 #1

Exhibit A - Chapter 7 Involuntary Petition

#7

#6

#5

4 #2

Exhibit B - Sept. 21, 2018 Letter

4 #1

Exhibit A - Term Note and Charter Agreement

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Summons and Complaint

#1

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

01/03/2019
View Court Documents

(#9) Opposition to #7 Motion to stay filed by Aaron Handler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 12/6/18 e-mail)(Krebs, Patrick) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/02/2019
View Court Documents

Order [non-document] granting in part Defendant Maguire's Motion for Leave to Plead (Related Doc #8 ). Defendant shall have 30 days from the date of this Order in which to file a responsive pleading. Defendant may seek a further extension, if necessary. Approved by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 1/2/2018.(R,Sh) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/20/2018
View Court Documents

(#8) Motion for leave to plead until completion of bankruptcy case or 14 days after the Court's ruling on #7 Motion to Stay filed by Defendant Matthew R. Maguire. (Konicki, Justine) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/20/2018
View Court Documents

(#7) Motion to stay filed by Defendant Matthew R. Maguire. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Chapter 7 Involuntary Petition)(Konicki, Justine) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/14/2018
View Court Documents

(#6) Opposition to #3 Motion to dismiss filed by Aaron Handler. (Krebs, Patrick) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/06/2018
View Court Documents

(#5) Attorney Appearance by Daniel H. Bryan filed by on behalf of Aaron Handler. (Bryan, Daniel) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/06/2018
View Court Documents

(#4) First Amended complaint against Matthew R. Maguire, One Jet, Inc.. Filed by Aaron Handler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Term Note and Charter Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Sept. 21, 2018 Letter) (Krebs, Patrick) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2018
View Court Documents

(#3) Motion to dismiss filed by Defendant Matthew R. Maguire. (Konicki, Justine) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2018
View Court Documents

(#2) Magistrate Consent Form issued. (B,R) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2018

Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (B,R) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2018

Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case, (B,R) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2018
View Court Documents

(#1) Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga Common Pleas, case number CV-18-905130 with jury demand. Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-9000612. Filed by Matthew R. Maguire, Matthew R. Maguire. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Konicki, Justine) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less