This case was last updated from PACER on 09/16/2018 at 07:31:26 (UTC).

Hammond v. Atrium Medical Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 07/18/2018 Hammond filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Atrium Medical Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Hampshire District. The Judge overseeing this case is Landya B. McCafferty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00635

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Landya B. McCafferty

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tineka Hammond

Defendants

Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC

Atrium Medical Corporation

Getinge AB

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jon C. Conlin

Attorney at Cory Watson Attorneys

2131 Magnolia Ave South

Birmingham, AL 35205

Defendant Attorneys

Pierre A. Chabot

Attorney at Wadleigh Starr & Peters PLLC

95 Market St

Manchester, NH 03101

Enjolique D. Aytch

Attorney at Akerman LLP

350 E Las Olas Blvd, Ste 1600

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Hugh J. Turner, Jr.

Attorney at Akerman LLP

350 E Las Olas Blvd, Ste 1600

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Atrium Medical Corporation, Getinge AB, Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC by Atrium Medical Corporation, Getinge AB, Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC. (Aytch, Enjolique) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

#10

(#10) Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY DEADLINE filed by Atrium Medical Corporation, Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC. 1:16-md-02753-LM et al.(Turner, Hugh) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

#12

(#9) ORDER MDL Transfer In No. CTO-10. Conditional transfer of case: New Jersey, 2:18-cv-11832. (de) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

#6

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

5 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A Revised Plaintiffs' Fact Sheet

5 #842

(#6) NOTICE of PLAINTIFFS' AND DEFENDANTS' JOINT AGENDA FOR THE STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUGUST 16, 2018 by Atrium Medical Corporation, Getinge AB, Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Revised Plaintiffs' Fact Sheet)(Turner, Hugh) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

#4

(#5) Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to JOINT MOTION TO AMEND PROCEDURAL ORDER AND TO EXTEND DEADLINES FOR JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY AND BRIEFING filed by Atrium Medical Corporation, Getinge AB, Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC. 1:16-md-02753-LM et al.(Turner, Hugh) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

#3

(#4) NOTICE of Notice of Initial Discovery Pool Selections by Atrium Medical Corporation, Getinge AB, Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC.(Turner, Hugh) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1687370 filed by Tineka Hammond. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Conlin, Jon) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2018
  • TELEPHONE CONFERENCE CANCELLED. At the request of parties' lead counsel, the Telephone Status Conference set for 9/13/2018 at 3:00 PM EST is cancelled.(de) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • ENDORSED ORDER granting (876) Motion to Extend Time JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY DEADLINE in case 1:16-md-02753-LM and the respective pleading in the underlying civil cases. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(de) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • ENDORSED ORDER re: 875 Notice of Subpoena in 16-md-2753-LM. Text of Order: Reviewed. So Ordered by Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(de) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY DEADLINE filed by Atrium Medical Corporation, Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC. 1:16-md-02753-LM et al.(Turner, Hugh) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • NOTICE of Hearing. Telephone Status Conference set for 9/13/2018 at 3:00 PM EST before Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(de) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER MDL Transfer In No. CTO-10. Conditional transfer of case: New Jersey, 2:18-cv-11832. (de) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings for Telephone Conference held on 8/16/2018. Court Reporter: Sandra Bailey, Telephone # 603 225-1454. Transcript is available for public inspection, but may not be copied or otherwise reproduced, at the Clerk's Office for a period of 90 days. Additionally, only attorneys of record and pro se parties with an ECF login and password who purchase a transcript from the court reporter will have access to the transcript through PACER during this 90-day period. If you would like to order a copy, please contact the court reporter at the above listed phone number.NOTICE: Any party who requests an original transcript has 21 days from service of this notice to determine whether it is necessary to redact any personal identifiers and, if so, to electronically file a Redaction Request. Redaction Request Follow Up 9/10/2018. Redacted Transcript Follow Up 9/20/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/15/2018.(de) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • ENDORSED ORDER. Text of Order: The court approves the request of the parties outlined in paragraph 3 of the joint agenda (doc. no. 842) to amend Section V. E. of the Plaintiff Fact Sheet in Amended Case Management Order 3G. Since the original order (doc. no. 135) and the amended order (doc. no. 135-1) included Exhibit C as part of the order, the entire order and all attachments (as amended) will be docketed in the original docket entry as Second Amended Case Management Order 3G (doc. no. 135-2). To be clear, document no. 135-2 is replacing document nos. 135 and 135-1. So Ordered by Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(de) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Landya B. McCafferty. TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 8/16/2018. (Court Reporter: Sandra Bailey) (Pltfs Attys: Jonathan Orent, David Selby, Susan Lowry, Adam Evans, Anne Schiavone) (Defts Attys: Enjolique Aytch, Pierre Chabot, Jack Friberg)(Total Hearing Time: 17 minutes) (de) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • ENDORSED ORDER re: 841 in 16-md-2753-LM and the respective pleadings in the civil cases JOINT MOTION TO AMEND PROCEDURAL ORDER AND TO EXTEND DEADLINES FOR JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY AND BRIEFING. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(de) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of PLAINTIFFS' AND DEFENDANTS' JOINT AGENDA FOR THE STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUGUST 16, 2018 by Atrium Medical Corporation, Getinge AB, Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Revised Plaintiffs' Fact Sheet)(Turner, Hugh) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to JOINT MOTION TO AMEND PROCEDURAL ORDER AND TO EXTEND DEADLINES FOR JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY AND BRIEFING filed by Atrium Medical Corporation, Getinge AB, Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC. 1:16-md-02753-LM et al.(Turner, Hugh) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Notice of Initial Discovery Pool Selections by Atrium Medical Corporation, Getinge AB, Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC.(Turner, Hugh) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Atrium Medical Corporation, Getinge AB, Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC by Atrium Medical Corporation, Getinge AB, Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC. (Aytch, Enjolique) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings for Telephone Conference held on 7/12/2018. Court Reporter: Susan Bateman, Telephone # 603 225-1453. Transcript is available for public inspection, but may not be copied or otherwise reproduced, at the Clerk's Office for a period of 90 days. Additionally, only attorneys of record and pro se parties with an ECF login and password who purchase a transcript from the court reporter will have access to the transcript through PACER during this 90-day period. If you would like to order a copy, please contact the court reporter at the above listed phone number.NOTICE: Any party who requests an original transcript has 21 days from service of this notice to determine whether it is necessary to redact any personal identifiers and, if so, to electronically file a Redaction Request. Redaction Request Follow Up 8/9/2018. Redacted Transcript Follow Up 8/20/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/15/2018.(de) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • Case assigned to Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-635-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1687370 filed by Tineka Hammond. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Conlin, Jon) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Maquet Cardiovascular US, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jon C. Conlin